Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ralf Loose (until 2015-12-19) | 1963-01-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
25 | Daniel Masuch (until 2015-06-30) | 1977-04-24 | |||
35 | Max Schulze Niehues (until 2024-06-30) | 1988-11-11 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Philip Rohe (until 2015-06-30) | 1994-04-25 | |||
3 | Fabian Hergesell (until 2015-06-30) | 1985-12-25 | |||
4 | Aaron Berzel (from 2015-01-14) (until 2015-08-31) | 1992-05-29 | |||
5 | Patrick Kirsch (until 2015-06-30) | 1981-01-01 | |||
6 | Kevin Schoneberg (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-08-24 | |||
8 | Marc Heitmeier (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-03-18 | |||
15 | Simon Scherder | 1993-04-02 | |||
16 | Dominik Schmidt (until 2015-06-30) | 1987-07-01 | |||
24 | Marco Pischorn (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-01-01 | |||
31 | Thorsten Schulz (from 2015-01-30) (until 2015-06-30) | 1984-12-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Marcus Piossek (until 2015-08-31) | 1989-07-21 | |||
10 | Amaury Bischoff (until 2017-01-20) | 1987-03-31 | |||
14 | Julian Riedel (until 2015-06-30) | 1991-08-10 | |||
17 | Erik Zenga (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-01-18 | |||
20 | Philipp Hoffmann (until 2020-07-05) | 1992-06-19 | |||
21 | Jens Truckenbrod (until 2015-06-30) | 1980-02-18 | |||
27 | Mehmet Kara (until 2017-06-30) | 1983-11-21 | |||
30 | Benjamin Siegert (until 2015-06-30) | 1981-07-07 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Marcel Reichwein (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-02-21 | |||
11 | Abdenour Amachaibou (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-01-22 | |||
19 | Rogier Krohne (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-11-23 | |||
23 | Emil Atlason (from 2015-02-02) (until 2015-06-30) | 1993-07-22 | |||
26 | Michael Holt (until 2015-06-30) | 1986-02-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2014-08-17 16:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |