Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Tayfun Korkut (from 2016-06-15) (until 2016-12-27) | 1974-04-02 | ||||
Konrad Funfstuck (from 2015-09-23) (until 2016-05-20) | 1980-10-07 | ||||
Kosta Runjaic (until 2015-09-23) | 1971-06-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Marius Muller (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-07-12 | |||
22 | Julian Pollersbeck (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-08-16 | |||
33 | Zlatan Alomerovic (until 2016-08-31) | 1991-06-15 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Johannes Reichert (from 2016-01-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-07-02 | ||||
3 | Tim Heubach (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-05-12 | |||
4 | Patrick Ziegler (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-02-09 | |||
5 | Sascha Mockenhaupt (until 2016-08-16) | 1991-09-10 | |||
7 | Michael Schulze (until 2016-08-31) | 1989-01-13 | |||
17 | Andre Fomitschow (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-09-07 | |||
29 | Stipe Vucur (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-05-22 | |||
31 | Chris Lowe (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-04-16 | |||
38 | Michael Schindele (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-01-27 | |||
39 | Jean Zimmer (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-12-06 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Markus Karl (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-02-14 | ||||
6 | Alexander Ring (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-04-09 | |||
8 | Marcus Piossek (from 2015-08-31) (until 2016-08-31) | 1989-07-21 | |||
11 | Ruben Jenssen (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-05-04 | |||
18 | Erik Thommy (until 2016-01-31) | 1994-08-20 | |||
19 | Marcel Gaus (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-08-02 | |||
23 | Mateusz Klich (until 2016-08-26) | 1990-06-13 | |||
24 | Tino Schmidt (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-10-02 | |||
27 | Mario Pokar (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-01-18 | |||
28 | Daniel Halfar (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-01-07 | |||
36 | Manfred Osei Kwadwo (until 2016-08-04) | 1995-05-30 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Jan-Lucas Dorow (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-04-26 | ||||
8 | Stefan Mugosa (until 2015-08-15) | 1992-02-26 | |||
9 | Lukas Gortler (until 2017-08-02) | 1994-06-15 | |||
10 | Antonio-Mirko Colak (from 2015-08-04) (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-09-17 | |||
13 | Robert Pich (from 2015-08-31) (until 2016-02-09) | 1988-11-12 | |||
14 | Sebastian Jacob (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-06-26 | |||
15 | Jon Bodvarsson (from 2016-01-01) (until 2016-08-02) | 1992-05-25 | |||
20 | Kacper Przybylko (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-03-25 | |||
27 | Maurice Deville (until 2016-08-07) | 1992-07-31 | |||
30 | Erik Wekesser (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-07-03 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Robert Pich (from 2016-02-09) (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-11-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2015-08-09 18:30 |
4 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2015-10-27 20:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |