Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Norbert Meier (until 2016-06-30) | 1958-09-20 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Wolfgang Hesl (until 2017-06-30) | 1986-01-13 | |||
33 | Nikolai Rehnen (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-02-04 | |||
34 | Daniel Davari (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-01-06 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Steffen Lang (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-08-14 | |||
3 | Brian Behrendt (until 2020-12-31) | 1991-10-24 | |||
11 | Stephan Salger (until 2020-08-31) | 1990-01-30 | |||
13 | Julian Borner (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-01-21 | |||
14 | Manuel Hornig (until 2017-06-30) | 1982-12-18 | |||
19 | Felix Burmeister (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-03-09 | |||
23 | Florian Dick (until 2018-06-30) | 1984-11-09 | |||
27 | Sebastian Schuppan (until 2017-06-30) | 1986-07-18 | |||
29 | Samir Benamar (until 2016-01-22) | 1992-08-23 | |||
38 | Jonas Strifler (until 2016-01-14) | 1990-01-30 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Marco Hober (until 2016-07-30) | 1995-09-09 | ||||
5 | David Ulm (until 2018-06-30) | 1984-06-30 | |||
6 | Tom Schutz (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-01-20 | |||
7 | Michael Gorlitz (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-03-08 | |||
8 | Daniel Brinkmann (until 2017-01-23) | 1986-01-29 | |||
16 | Dennis Mast (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-02-15 | |||
20 | Manuel Junglas (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-01-31 | |||
21 | Amin Affane (from 2015-08-31) (until 2016-01-05) | 1994-01-21 | |||
22 | Francisco Rodriguez (from 2016-01-22) (until 2016-08-30) | 1995-09-14 | |||
22 | Bashkim Renneke (until 2015-07-21) | 1992-12-10 | |||
24 | Peer Kluge (until 2016-06-30) | 1980-11-22 | |||
25 | Bjorn Jopek (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-08-24 | |||
32 | Keanu Staude (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-01-26 | |||
37 | Christian Muller (until 2016-06-30) | 1984-02-28 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Fabian Klos (until 2024-06-30) | 1987-12-02 | |||
10 | Seung-Woo Ryu (from 2016-02-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-12-17 | |||
17 | Christoph Hemlein (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-12-16 | |||
18 | Christopher Nothe (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-01-03 | |||
21 | Andreas Voglsammer (from 2016-01-20) (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-01-09 | |||
28 | Koen van der Biezen (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-07-10 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Marco Hober (from 2016-01-08) (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-09-09 | ||||
Samir Benamar (from 2016-01-22) (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-08-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2015-08-10 18:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |