Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Pep Guardiola (until 2016-06-30) | 1971-01-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Manuel Neuer | 1986-03-27 | |||
22 | Tom Starke (until 2018-06-30) | 1981-03-18 | |||
26 | Sven Ulreich (until 2020-10-02) | 1988-08-03 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Dante (until 2015-08-30) | 1983-10-18 | ||||
4 | Serdar Tasci (from 2016-02-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-04-24 | |||
5 | Medhi Benatia (until 2016-07-15) | 1987-04-17 | |||
13 | Rafinha (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-09-07 | |||
14 | Juan Bernat (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-03-01 | |||
15 | Jan Kirchhoff (until 2016-01-07) | 1990-10-01 | |||
17 | Jerome Boateng (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-09-03 | |||
21 | Philipp Lahm (until 2017-06-30) | 1983-11-11 | |||
27 | David Alaba (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-06-24 | |||
28 | Holger Badstuber (until 2017-01-10) | 1989-03-13 | |||
39 | Phillipp Steinhart (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-07-07 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Fabian Benko (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-06-05 | ||||
Niklas Dorsch (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-01-15 | ||||
6 | Thiago Alcantara (until 2020-09-17) | 1991-04-11 | |||
7 | Franck Ribery (until 2019-06-30) | 1983-04-07 | |||
8 | Javi Martinez (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-09-02 | |||
11 | Douglas Costa (until 2017-07-11) | 1990-09-14 | |||
14 | Xabi Alonso (until 2017-06-30) | 1981-11-25 | |||
16 | Gianluca Gaudino (until 2016-01-09) | 1996-11-11 | |||
19 | Mario Gotze (until 2016-07-21) | 1992-06-03 | |||
20 | Sebastian Rode (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-10-11 | |||
23 | Arturo Vidal (from 2015-07-28) (until 2018-08-03) | 1987-05-22 | |||
31 | Bastian Schweinsteiger (until 2015-07-13) | 1984-08-01 | |||
32 | Joshua Kimmich (until 2020-09-17) | 1995-02-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Patrick Weihrauch (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-03-03 | ||||
9 | Robert Lewandowski (until 2022-07-18) | 1988-08-21 | |||
10 | Arjen Robben (until 2019-06-30) | 1984-01-23 | |||
24 | Sinan Kurt (until 2016-01-07) | 1996-07-23 | |||
25 | Thomas Muller | 1989-09-13 | |||
29 | Kingsley Coman (from 2015-08-30) (until 2024-06-30) | 1996-06-13 | |||
37 | Julian Green (until 2016-12-20) | 1995-06-06 | |||
41 | Milos Pantovic (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-07-07 | |||
verliehen | |||||
16 | Gianluca Gaudino (from 2016-01-09) (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-11-11 | |||
34 | Pierre-Emile Hojbjerg (from 2015-08-28) (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-08-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2015-08-09 16:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2015-10-27 20:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2015-12-15 20:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2016-02-10 20:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2016-04-19 20:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2016-05-21 20:00 |
4 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |