Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Tomasz Kaczmarek (until 2016-06-30) | 1984-09-20 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Nico Pellatz (until 2017-06-30) | 1986-07-08 | |||
23 | Alexander Monath (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-08-30 | |||
27 | Michael Vogel (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-06-13 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Markus Brzenska (until 2017-06-30) | 1984-05-25 | |||
3 | Sascha Eichmeier (from 2016-02-01) (until 2020-07-05) | 1990-01-02 | |||
3 | Tobias Haitz (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-02-12 | |||
11 | Michael Lejan (until 2017-06-30) | 1983-05-02 | |||
12 | Dennis Malura (until 2016-06-30) | 1984-06-20 | |||
14 | Roberto Guirino (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-01-22 | |||
15 | Daniel Reiche (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-03-14 | |||
21 | Andre Wallenborn (from 2015-08-06) (until 2019-01-23) | 1995-03-25 | |||
28 | Patrick Koronkiewicz | 1991-03-13 | |||
36 | Dominik Lanius (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-03-28 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Claus Costa (until 2016-06-30) | 1984-06-15 | |||
5 | Jules Schwadorf (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-10-19 | |||
6 | Tim Jerat (until 2017-06-30) | 1982-03-05 | |||
7 | Florian Heister (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-03-02 | |||
7 | Connor Krempicki (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-09-14 | |||
8 | Mike Wunderlich (until 2021-06-30) | 1986-03-25 | |||
10 | Rene Klingenburg (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-12-29 | |||
13 | Lukas Nottbeck (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-10-22 | |||
16 | Mehdi Reichert (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-12-18 | |||
17 | Jules Reimerink (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-09-30 | |||
17 | Timo Staffeldt (until 2015-07-14) | 1984-02-09 | |||
22 | Florian Moritz (until 2016-01-26) | 1997-07-03 | |||
25 | Edwin Schwarz (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-09-13 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Sebastian van Santen (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-03-12 | |||
9 | Marcus Steegmann (until 2016-01-30) | 1981-02-04 | |||
16 | David Bors (from 2016-01-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-04-13 | |||
18 | Fabio Manuel Dias (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-10-28 | |||
20 | Sven Kreyer (until 2020-07-05) | 1991-05-14 | |||
22 | Fatih Candan (from 2016-01-30) (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-12-30 | |||
30 | Freddy Mombongo (until 2016-02-01) | 1985-08-30 | |||
33 | David Jansen (from 2016-01-26) (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-12-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2015-08-08 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2015-10-28 19:00 |
0 : 6 |
Schema Compare |