Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Falko Gotz (from 2016-04-11) (until 2016-06-30) | 1962-03-26 | ||||
Tomas Oral (until 2016-04-10) | 1973-04-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jan Eyrich (until 2016-06-30) | 2001-05-28 | ||||
1 | Andre Weis (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-09-30 | |||
18 | Jannis Pellowski (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-06-15 | |||
21 | Soren Pirson (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-08-27 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Ehsan Haji Safi (from 2015-08-31) (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-02-25 | |||
3 | Marc Hornschuh (until 2015-08-31) | 1991-03-02 | |||
4 | Gabriel Silva (from 2016-01-29) (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-03-03 | |||
4 | Tom Beugelsdijk (until 2015-08-21) | 1990-08-07 | |||
14 | Alexander Bittroff (until 2016-01-26) | 1988-09-19 | |||
15 | Alexander Huber (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-02-25 | |||
16 | Heinrich Schmidtgal (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-11-20 | |||
17 | Joan Oumari (until 2016-01-10) | 1988-08-19 | |||
24 | Shawn Maurice Barry (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-04-23 | |||
25 | Florian Ballas (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-01-08 | |||
27 | Lukas Gugganig (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-02-14 | |||
32 | Florijon Belegu (until 2016-01-07) | 1993-03-13 | |||
39 | Mateo Andacic (from 2015-09-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-11-16 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Manuel Konrad (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-04-14 | |||
6 | Fanol Perdedaj (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-07-16 | |||
7 | Marc-Andre Kruska (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-06-29 | |||
8 | Mario Engels (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-10-22 | |||
10 | Besar Halimi (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-12-12 | |||
13 | Zsolt Kalmar (from 2016-01-28) (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-06-09 | |||
14 | Niki Zimling (from 2016-02-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-04-19 | |||
17 | Joel Gerezgiher (from 2016-01-21) (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-10-09 | |||
23 | Nahom Gebru (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-08-26 | |||
26 | Denis Epstein (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-07-02 | |||
28 | Yann Rolim (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-03-15 | |||
30 | Denis Mangafic (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-12-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Edmond Kapllani (until 2016-06-30) | 1982-07-31 | |||
11 | In-Hyeok Park (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-12-29 | |||
19 | Dani Schahin (from 2015-07-16) (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-07-09 | |||
20 | Taiwo Awoniyi (from 2015-08-31) (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-08-12 | |||
22 | Timm Golley (until 2016-02-01) | 1991-02-17 | |||
29 | Zlatko Dedic (until 2016-06-30) | 1984-10-05 | |||
38 | Felipe Pires (from 2015-08-26) (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-04-18 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Leon Hammel (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-04-24 | ||||
Mohamed Amine Aoudia (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-06-06 | ||||
Marc Hornschuh (from 2015-08-31) (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-03-02 | ||||
Timm Golley (from 2016-02-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-02-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2015-08-07 19:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2015-10-27 19:00 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |