Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rico Schmitt (from 2016-04-13) (until 2018-06-30) | 1968-09-27 | ||||
Stefan Boger (from 2015-09-08) (until 2016-04-13) | 1966-06-01 | ||||
Sven Kohler (until 2015-08-30) | 1966-02-24 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Benjamin Duray (from 2015-08-30) (until 2015-09-07) | 1979-07-23 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Benjamin Duray (from 2015-09-08) (until 2016-06-30) | 1979-07-23 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Fabian Bredlow (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-03-02 | |||
30 | Pierre Kleinheider (until 2016-01-22) | 1989-11-07 | |||
31 | Lukas Konigshofer (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-03-16 | |||
32 | Tom Muller (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-11-27 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Dominic Rau (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-11-29 | |||
5 | Patrick Mouaya (until 2016-06-30) | 1984-07-06 | |||
7 | Florian Brugmann (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-01-23 | |||
13 | Stefan Kleineheismann (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-02-08 | |||
21 | Andre Wallenborn (from 2015-08-06) (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-03-25 | |||
25 | Marcel Baude (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-10-05 | |||
27 | Marco Engelhardt (until 2016-06-30) | 1980-12-02 | |||
28 | Jonas Acquistapace (from 2015-08-13) (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-06-18 | |||
33 | Robin Urban (until 2016-01-02) | 1994-04-13 | |||
34 | Max Barnofsky (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-03-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Ivica Banovic (until 2016-06-30) | 1980-08-02 | |||
6 | Toni Lindenhahn (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-11-15 | |||
9 | Bjorn Ziegenbein (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-04-30 | |||
11 | Mike-Steven Bahre (from 2016-01-29) (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-08-10 | |||
18 | Tim Kruse (until 2016-06-30) | 1983-01-10 | |||
20 | Soren Bertram (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-06-05 | |||
22 | Maximilian Jansen (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-05-26 | |||
23 | Sascha Pfeffer (until 2017-06-30) | 1986-10-19 | |||
26 | Dorian Diring (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-04-11 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Tobias Muller (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-05-31 | |||
10 | Selim Aydemir (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-10-26 | |||
14 | Timo Furuholm (until 2016-12-31) | 1987-10-11 | |||
20 | Lukas Stagge (from 2016-01-24) (until 2016-08-29) | 1997-05-11 | |||
35 | Osayamen Osawe (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-09-03 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Robin Urban (from 2016-01-02) (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-04-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2015-08-08 15:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |