Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ismail Atalan (until 2017-07-11) | 1980-04-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Dominik Bergdorf (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-02-03 | |||
30 | Benedikt Fernandez (from 2015-07-24) (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-01-08 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Felix Frank (until 2016-01-01) | 1991-08-15 | |||
4 | Gerrit Nauber (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-04-13 | |||
5 | Matthias Rahn (from 2015-08-12) (until 2020-01-04) | 1990-05-17 | |||
16 | Nico Neidhart (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-09-27 | |||
23 | Alexander Langlitz (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-02-15 | |||
25 | Jeron Al-Hazaimeh (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-02-13 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Tim Wendel (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-01-12 | |||
6 | Tim Gorschluter (until 2018-06-30) | 1983-08-24 | |||
7 | Alexander Hettich (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-03-11 | |||
8 | Andre Dej (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-02-06 | |||
13 | Daniel Latkowski (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-11-11 | |||
15 | Moritz Heyer (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-04-04 | |||
17 | Nico Granatowski (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-06-03 | |||
20 | Kevin Pires-Rodrigues (from 2016-01-05) (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-09-12 | |||
27 | Dennis Brock (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-02-27 | |||
31 | Pascal Schmidt (until 2016-01-14) | 1992-01-17 | |||
34 | Benjamin Siegert (until 2016-06-30) | 1981-07-07 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Semih Daglar (until 2016-12-31) | 1993-01-08 | |||
10 | Bernd Rosinger (from 2015-07-17) (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-08-30 | |||
11 | Luka Tankulic (from 2016-02-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-06-21 | |||
19 | Kevin Freiberger (from 2015-07-04) (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-11-16 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2015-08-08 15:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |