Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Claus Schromm (until 2020-07-28) | 1969-04-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Stefan Marinovic (until 2017-07-18) | 1991-10-07 | |||
15 | Sebastian Wolf (from 2015-08-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-03-01 | |||
22 | Maximilian Hehn (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-04-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Robert Muller (until 2015-07-02) | 1986-11-12 | ||||
2 | Maximilian Bauer (until 2020-07-05) | 1995-02-23 | |||
3 | Sebastian Koch (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-01-01 | |||
4 | Alexander Winkler (until 2020-07-05) | 1992-01-26 | |||
5 | Josef Welzmuller (until 2024-06-30) | 1990-01-10 | |||
8 | Max Dombrowka (from 2015-08-03) (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-03-24 | |||
17 | Jonas Hummels (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-08-05 | |||
21 | Paul Niehaus (until 2016-01-01) | 1995-07-10 | |||
27 | Leon Volz (until 2016-01-21) | 1996-12-24 | |||
32 | Tim Schels (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-12-28 | |||
38 | Marco Rosenzweig (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-01-15 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Ulrich Taffertshofer (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-02-14 | |||
7 | Alexander Sieghart (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-07-29 | |||
10 | Maximilian Nicu (from 2015-08-25) (until 2018-06-30) | 1982-11-25 | |||
16 | Vincent Friedrich (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-01-21 | |||
17 | Luca Marseiler (from 2016-01-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-02-18 | |||
19 | Alexander Piller (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-07-12 | |||
21 | Sascha Bigalke (from 2016-01-24) (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-01-08 | |||
30 | Luca Marseiler (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-02-18 | |||
31 | Orestis Kiomourtzoglou (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-05-07 | |||
34 | Sebastian Wiesbock (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-04-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Dominic Reisner (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-11-14 | |||
12 | Markus Einsiedler (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-01-27 | |||
13 | Michael Krabler (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-10-22 | |||
14 | Caleb Clarke (from 2016-02-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-06-23 | |||
18 | Thomas Steinherr (from 2015-08-17) (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-05-04 | |||
24 | Fabian Mohrle (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-05-29 | |||
27 | Vitalij Lux (from 2016-02-01) (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-02-27 | |||
28 | Nicolas Hinterseer (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-03-13 | |||
29 | Franz Rathmann (until 2017-01-16) | 1996-12-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2015-08-09 16:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2015-10-27 20:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2015-12-15 19:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |