Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Georgi Donkow (until 2017-06-30) | 1970-06-02 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Denis Grgic (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-09-19 | |||
1 | Matthias Hamrol (from 2015-09-05) (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-12-31 | |||
12 | Max Wohlfahrt (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-05-01 | |||
22 | Enes Durmaz (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-05-10 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Maximilian Frolich (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-10-11 | |||
4 | Lukas Hartmann (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-07-25 | |||
5 | Rouven Wiesner (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-02-19 | |||
7 | Denis Lubke (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-10-29 | |||
8 | Giuseppe Ricciardi (until 2017-06-30) | 1984-04-14 | |||
15 | Magnus Haas (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-03-22 | |||
20 | Tom Schiffel (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-09-23 | |||
29 | Ivans Gomis (from 2015-09-16) (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-02-02 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Tomislav Cilic (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-08-12 | ||||
Sebastian Gleissner (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-11-18 | ||||
2 | Heiko Schall (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-10-15 | |||
6 | Pierre Eiberger (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-07-13 | |||
9 | Marc Golinski (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-09-03 | |||
16 | Valentin Vochatzer (from 2015-07-09) (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-02-03 | |||
19 | Anthony Jarvis Coppola (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-11-23 | |||
21 | Andreas Maier (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-04-24 | |||
23 | Daniel Seemann (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-12-28 | |||
23 | Maurice Heim (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-09-21 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Gabriel Alleoni (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-09-07 | ||||
Haitham Obeyapwa (until 2016-06-30) | |||||
10 | Daniel Schachtschneider (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-04-20 | |||
14 | Ante Galic (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-11-20 | |||
17 | Francis Ubabuike (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-11-17 | |||
18 | Alessio Bennardo (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-02-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2015-08-08 20:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2015-10-28 20:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |