Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Tomislav Stipic (from 2015-11-09) (until 2016-06-30) | 1979-08-01 | ||||
Horst Steffen (until 2015-11-04) | 1969-03-03 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Alfred Kaminski (from 2015-11-04) (until 2015-11-09) | 1964-02-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Korbinian Muller (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-02-06 | |||
26 | Rouven Sattelmaier (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-08-07 | |||
38 | Carl Klaus (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-01-16 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
4 | Hendrik Starostzik (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-03-28 | |||
5 | Manuel Bihr (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-09-17 | |||
16 | Fabio Leutenecker (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-03-15 | |||
21 | Marc Stein (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-07-07 | |||
25 | Alessandro Abruscia (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-07-12 | |||
27 | Fabian Baumgartel (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-07-07 | |||
29 | Tobias Pachonik (from 2015-07-14) (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-01-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Sandrino Braun (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-07-04 | |||
8 | Gerrit Muller (until 2016-06-30) | 1984-04-26 | |||
10 | Enzo Marchese (until 2016-06-30) | 1983-05-19 | |||
12 | Andreas Ivan (until 2016-01-28) | 1995-01-10 | |||
13 | Klaus Gjasula (from 2016-01-03) (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-12-14 | |||
17 | Gratas Sirgedas (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-12-17 | |||
18 | Marco Gaiser (until 2016-01-22) | 1993-01-11 | |||
22 | Jose Ikeng (from 2016-01-05) (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-01-30 | |||
23 | Daniel Kaiser (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-11-18 | |||
24 | Edisson Jordanov (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-06-08 | |||
28 | Bentley Baxter Bahn (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-08-28 | |||
33 | Markus Mendler (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-01-07 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Daniel Lang (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-05-17 | ||||
7 | Marco Calamita (until 2016-06-30) | 1983-03-22 | |||
9 | Petar Sliskovic (from 2016-01-21) (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-02-21 | |||
9 | Elia Soriano (until 2016-01-20) | 1989-06-26 | |||
11 | Lhadji Badiane (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-04-16 | |||
14 | Lasse Lehmann (from 2015-08-18) (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-05-20 | |||
19 | Daniel Engelbrecht (until 2016-01-10) | 1990-11-05 | |||
20 | Bajram Nebihi (from 2016-01-03) (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-08-05 | |||
32 | Stephane Mvibudulu (from 2016-01-11) (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-05-18 | |||
37 | Manuel Fischer (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-09-19 | |||
40 | Erich Berko (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-09-06 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Marco Gaiser (from 2016-01-22) (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-01-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2015-08-08 15:30 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |