Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Christian Neidhart (until 2020-07-05) | 1968-10-01 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Mario Neumann (until 2016-06-30) | 1966-12-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Benjamin Gommert (until 2017-06-30) | 1985-05-01 | |||
32 | Lars Huxsohl (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-06-10 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Janik Jesgarzewski (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-01-26 | |||
5 | Jovan Vidovic (from 2016-01-29) (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-01-06 | |||
6 | Dennis Geiger (until 2018-06-30) | 1984-06-30 | |||
15 | Martin Hudec (until 2016-01-01) | 1982-04-15 | |||
16 | Yannic Suchanke (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-02-27 | |||
18 | Sebastian Schepers (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-05-16 | |||
20 | Kerem Sahan (until 2016-01-01) | 1996-04-23 | |||
23 | Marcel Thomas (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-01-07 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Maurice Trindade (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-02-28 | ||||
Bernd Krussel (from 2016-01-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-07-16 | ||||
4 | Jan-Luca Ahillen (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-10-24 | |||
7 | Marc Schnier (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-02-07 | |||
9 | Viktor Maier (until 2016-07-12) | 1990-05-16 | |||
10 | Martin Wagner (until 2019-06-30) | 1986-09-16 | |||
11 | Thorben Deters (until 2019-01-31) | 1995-08-20 | |||
14 | Johan Wigger (until 2016-06-30) | 1985-11-02 | |||
21 | Jens Robben (until 2018-06-30) | 1983-04-27 | |||
25 | Patrick Posipal (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-03-03 | |||
36 | Dennis Strompen (from 2015-07-20) (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-01-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Nico Gill (from 2016-01-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-03-05 | ||||
8 | Muhamed Alawie (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-04-30 | |||
17 | Max Kremer (until 2020-07-05) | 1989-06-21 | |||
22 | Erdogan Pini (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-01-06 | |||
38 | Mirco Born (from 2015-07-22) (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-06-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2015-08-08 15:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |