Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Denny Skwierczynski (until 2016-06-30) | 1974-02-14 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Michael Hopp (from 2016-01-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1980-06-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jonas Toboll (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-06-10 | |||
18 | Kennet Kostmann (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-09-01 | |||
27 | Eric Schlomm (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-12-27 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Lukas Knechtel (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-07-09 | |||
4 | Dennis Wehrendt (until 2018-07-05) | 1987-02-25 | |||
5 | Marc Lindenberg (from 2016-01-12) (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-01-11 | |||
23 | Patrick Bohnsack (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-12-07 | |||
25 | Cedric Szymczak (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-08-12 | |||
26 | Moritz Marheineke (until 2018-06-30) | 1985-02-20 | |||
33 | Jan-Andre Sievers (until 2017-07-10) | 1987-08-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Aleksandar Nogovic (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-05-10 | |||
8 | Dennis Voss (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-06-06 | |||
10 | Marcello Meyer (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-10-05 | |||
13 | Marvin Thiel (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-01-29 | |||
14 | Nils Lange (until 2016-06-30) | 1986-06-15 | |||
15 | Kubilay Buyukdemir (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-08-06 | |||
16 | Enes Dagli (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-08-21 | |||
20 | Yannick Bremser (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-08-31 | |||
21 | Maurice Maletzki (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-09-08 | |||
22 | Derek Cornelius (from 2016-01-01) (until 2016-07-29) | 1997-11-25 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Christopher Kramer (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-10-16 | |||
9 | Henrik Sirmais (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-02-20 | |||
11 | Stefan Richter (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-01-27 | |||
19 | Timo Barendt (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-03-17 | |||
28 | Cemal Sezer (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-02-27 | |||
30 | Andre Senger (until 2016-06-30) | 1989-02-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2015-08-09 16:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |