Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dieter Hecking (until 2016-10-17) | 1964-09-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Niklas Klinger (from 2016-01-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-10-13 | ||||
1 | Diego Benaglio (until 2017-06-30) | 1983-09-08 | |||
20 | Max Grun (until 2018-06-30) | 1987-04-05 | |||
28 | Koen Casteels (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-06-25 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Jannes Horn (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-02-06 | ||||
4 | Marcel Schafer (until 2017-03-01) | 1984-06-07 | |||
5 | Timm Klose (until 2016-01-17) | 1988-05-09 | |||
6 | Carlos Ascues (from 2015-07-23) (until 2017-01-04) | 1992-06-19 | |||
18 | Dante (from 2015-08-30) (until 2016-08-21) | 1983-10-18 | |||
24 | Sebastian Jung (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-06-22 | |||
25 | Naldo (until 2016-06-30) | 1982-09-10 | |||
26 | Felipe (until 2016-06-30) | 1987-08-07 | |||
31 | Robin Knoche (until 2020-08-04) | 1992-05-22 | |||
34 | Ricardo Rodriguez (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-08-25 | |||
37 | Moritz Sprenger (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-02-22 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Daniel Caligiuri (until 2017-01-24) | 1988-01-15 | |||
8 | Vieirinha (until 2017-08-31) | 1986-01-24 | |||
9 | Ivan Perisic (until 2015-08-30) | 1989-02-02 | |||
10 | Julian Draxler (from 2015-08-31) (until 2017-01-02) | 1993-09-20 | |||
10 | Aaron Hunt (until 2015-08-31) | 1986-09-04 | |||
14 | Kevin De Bruyne (until 2015-08-30) | 1991-06-28 | |||
15 | Christian Trasch (until 2017-08-30) | 1987-09-01 | |||
22 | Luiz Gustavo (until 2017-07-04) | 1987-07-23 | |||
23 | Josuha Guilavogui (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-09-19 | |||
27 | Maximilian Arnold | 1994-05-27 | |||
30 | Paul Seguin (until 2017-08-30) | 1995-03-29 | |||
35 | Francisco Rodriguez (from 2015-07-21) (until 2016-01-21) | 1995-09-14 | |||
38 | Ismail Azzaoui (from 2015-08-30) (until 2016-06-30) | 1998-01-06 | |||
Sturm | |||||
3 | Nicklas Bendtner (until 2016-04-25) | 1988-01-16 | |||
11 | Max Kruse (until 2016-08-01) | 1988-03-19 | |||
12 | Bas Dost (until 2016-08-28) | 1989-05-31 | |||
17 | Andre Schurrle (until 2016-07-21) | 1990-11-06 | |||
19 | Bruno Henrique (from 2016-01-29) (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-12-30 | |||
32 | Leandro Putaro (from 2016-01-01) (until 2016-08-05) | 1997-01-07 | |||
32 | Oskar Zawada (until 2016-02-01) | 1996-02-01 | |||
33 | Sebastian Stolze (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-01-29 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Patrick Drewes (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-02-04 | ||||
Francisco Rodriguez (from 2016-01-22) (until 2016-08-30) | 1995-09-14 | ||||
Oskar Zawada (from 2016-02-01) (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-02-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2015-08-08 15:30 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2015-10-27 20:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |