Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Viktor Skripnik (until 2016-09-18) | 1969-11-19 | ||||
Teammanager | |||||
Tim Barten (from 2016-06-01) (until 2021-06-30) | 1976-08-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Michael Zetterer (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-07-12 | ||||
1 | Raphael Wolf (until 2017-06-11) | 1988-06-06 | |||
18 | Gerhard Tremmel (from 2016-01-28) (until 2016-06-30) | 1978-11-16 | |||
30 | Michael Zetterer (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-07-12 | |||
40 | Raif Husic (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-02-05 | |||
42 | Felix Wiedwald (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-03-15 | |||
43 | Eric Oelschlagel (from 2016-01-24) (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-09-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Santiago Garcia (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-07-08 | |||
3 | Papy Djilobodji (from 2016-01-21) (until 2016-06-30) | 1988-12-01 | |||
4 | Alejandro Galvez (until 2016-08-02) | 1989-06-06 | |||
5 | Assani Lukimya (until 2016-01-17) | 1986-01-25 | |||
7 | Jannik Vestergaard (until 2016-06-30) | 1992-08-03 | |||
8 | Clemens Fritz (until 2017-06-30) | 1980-12-07 | |||
13 | Milos Veljkovic (from 2016-02-01) | 1995-09-26 | |||
13 | Milos Veljkovic (from 2016-02-01) (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-09-26 | |||
15 | Mateo Pavlovic (until 2016-06-30) | 1990-06-09 | |||
19 | Luca Zander (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-08-09 | |||
20 | Ulisses Garcia (until 2018-01-04) | 1996-01-11 | |||
23 | Theodor Gebre Selassie (until 2021-06-30) | 1986-12-24 | |||
25 | Oliver Husing (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-02-17 | |||
29 | Leon Guwara (from 2016-01-01) (until 2016-08-31) | 1996-06-28 | |||
38 | Marnon Busch (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-12-08 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ludovic Obraniak (until 2015-08-26) | 1984-11-10 | ||||
5 | Sambou Yatabare (from 2016-01-28) (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-02-03 | |||
5 | Laszlo Kleinheisler (from 2016-01-20) (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-04-08 | |||
6 | Cedric Makiadi (until 2015-08-27) | 1984-02-23 | |||
10 | Levent Aycicek (until 2016-01-22) | 1994-02-12 | |||
11 | Levin Oztunali (until 2016-06-30) | 1996-03-15 | |||
14 | Izet Hajrovic (until 2015-08-30) | 1991-08-04 | |||
16 | Zlatko Junuzovic (until 2018-06-30) | 1987-09-26 | |||
17 | Ozkan Yildirim (until 2016-06-30) | 1993-04-10 | |||
18 | Felix Kroos (until 2016-01-28) | 1991-03-12 | |||
22 | Fin Bartels (until 2020-07-06) | 1987-02-07 | |||
26 | Julian von Haacke (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-02-14 | |||
27 | Florian Grillitsch (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-08-07 | |||
33 | Marcel Hilssner (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-01-30 | |||
35 | Maximilian Eggestein (until 2021-08-17) | 1996-12-08 | |||
39 | Lukas Frode (until 2017-01-01) | 1995-01-23 | |||
44 | Philipp Bargfrede (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-03-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Aron Johannsson (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-11-10 | |||
9 | Franco Di Santo (until 2015-07-25) | 1989-04-07 | |||
14 | Claudio Pizarro (from 2015-09-07) (until 2017-06-30) | 1978-10-03 | |||
21 | Anthony Ujah (until 2016-07-07) | 1990-10-14 | |||
28 | Melvyn Lorenzen (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-11-26 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Fallou Diagne (from 2016-01-10) (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-08-14 | ||||
Levent Aycicek (from 2016-01-22) (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-02-12 | ||||
Luca Caldirola (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-02-01 | ||||
Izet Hajrovic (from 2015-08-30) (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-08-04 | ||||
18 | Felix Kroos (from 2016-01-28) (until 2016-06-30) | 1991-03-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2015-08-08 15:30 |
0 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2015-10-28 20:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2015-12-15 19:00 |
3 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2016-02-09 19:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2016-04-19 20:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |