Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jeff Saibene (from 2017-03-19) (until 2018-12-10) | 1968-09-13 | ||||
Jurgen Kramny (from 2016-11-15) (until 2017-03-14) | 1971-10-18 | ||||
Rudiger Rehm (until 2016-10-21) | 1978-11-22 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Carsten Rump (from 2017-03-14) (until 2017-06-30) | 1981-03-21 | ||||
Carsten Rump (from 2016-10-22) (until 2016-11-14) | 1981-03-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Wolfgang Hesl (until 2017-06-30) | 1986-01-13 | |||
33 | Nikolai Rehnen (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-02-04 | |||
34 | Daniel Davari (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-01-06 | |||
40 | Baboucarr Gaye (from 2016-07-25) (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-02-24 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Steffen Lang (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-08-14 | |||
3 | Brian Behrendt (until 2020-12-31) | 1991-10-24 | |||
4 | Malcolm Cacutalua (from 2016-08-01) (until 2017-06-28) | 1994-11-15 | |||
11 | Stephan Salger (until 2020-08-31) | 1990-01-30 | |||
13 | Julian Borner (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-01-21 | |||
14 | Manuel Hornig (until 2017-06-30) | 1982-12-18 | |||
23 | Florian Dick (until 2018-06-30) | 1984-11-09 | |||
27 | Sebastian Schuppan (until 2017-06-30) | 1986-07-18 | |||
28 | Florian Hartherz (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-05-29 | |||
31 | Henri Weigelt (from 2017-03-17) (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-01-17 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Marco Hober (until 2016-07-30) | 1995-09-09 | ||||
5 | David Ulm (until 2018-06-30) | 1984-06-30 | |||
6 | Tom Schutz (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-01-20 | |||
7 | Michael Gorlitz (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-03-08 | |||
8 | Daniel Brinkmann (until 2017-01-23) | 1986-01-29 | |||
10 | Tomasz Holota (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-01-27 | |||
20 | Manuel Junglas (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-01-31 | |||
22 | Francisco Rodriguez (until 2016-08-30) | 1995-09-14 | |||
25 | Reinhold Yabo (from 2017-01-19) (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-02-10 | |||
30 | Michal Mak (from 2016-08-31) (until 2017-01-02) | 1991-11-14 | |||
32 | Keanu Staude (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-01-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Leandro Putaro (from 2016-08-05) (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-01-07 | ||||
9 | Fabian Klos (until 2024-06-30) | 1987-12-02 | |||
16 | Soren Brandy (from 2017-01-10) (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-05-06 | |||
17 | Christoph Hemlein (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-12-16 | |||
18 | Christopher Nothe (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-01-03 | |||
21 | Andreas Voglsammer (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-01-09 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Dennis Mast (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-02-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2016-08-20 15:30 |
4 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2016-10-25 18:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2017-02-07 18:30 |
4 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2017-02-28 18:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |