Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Andreas Mittelstadt (until 2017-06-30) | 1964-12-20 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Selvedin Begzadic (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-06-24 | ||||
Angelo Kempf (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-03-16 | ||||
Mateusz Mika (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-12-10 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Burak Aktas (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-02-05 | ||||
Nicklas Horn (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-02-12 | ||||
Lukas Mrosek (until 2017-06-30) | |||||
Ante Zore (until 2017-06-30) | 1985-07-05 | ||||
Damir Coric (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-05-11 | ||||
Christian Jacobeit (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-05-21 | ||||
Niklas Neugebauer (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-06-03 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gokhan Aslan (until 2017-06-30) | |||||
Kevin Capolei (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-01-08 | ||||
Okan Isik (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-05-18 | ||||
Joshua Lang (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-01-30 | ||||
Arber Shuleta (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-10-17 | ||||
Julian von Gliszczynski (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-08-27 | ||||
Marcel Berner (until 2017-06-30) | |||||
Emre Demir (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-09-21 | ||||
Luka Kujundzija (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-03-03 | ||||
Marcel Schulz (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-10-13 | ||||
Magnus Stahlberg (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-01-26 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Rommel Abou-Chaker (until 2017-06-30) | |||||
Moris Fikic (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-06-20 | ||||
Nicolai Kitzing (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-11-26 | ||||
Rene Robben (until 2017-06-30) | 1984-06-22 | ||||
Can Akgun (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-10-02 | ||||
Egzon Ismaili (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-04-10 | ||||
Eren Ozer (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-07-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2016-08-20 15:30 |
0 : 7 |
Schema Compare |