Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Oscar Corrochano (from 2016-10-03) (until 2017-06-30) | 1976-09-06 | ||||
Rudi Thommes (from 2017-04-12) (until 2017-06-30) | 1968-12-17 | ||||
Peter Rubeck (until 2016-09-21) | 1961-12-28 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Rudi Thommes (from 2016-09-22) (until 2016-12-31) | 1968-12-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Chris Keilmann (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-04-02 | |||
1 | Matheo Raab (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-12-18 | |||
16 | Till Brinkmann (from 2017-01-31) (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-11-01 | |||
23 | Andrei Popescu (until 2017-06-30) | 1985-02-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
4 | Simon Maurer (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-04-06 | |||
5 | Josef Cinar (from 2017-01-04) (until 2019-06-30) | 1984-01-22 | |||
5 | Adrian Schneider (until 2016-12-21) | 1991-10-25 | |||
13 | Lucas Jacob (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-03-18 | |||
17 | Lukas Achterberg (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-02-18 | |||
20 | Michael Dingels (until 2017-06-30) | 1986-01-04 | |||
22 | Michael Blum (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-12-25 | |||
28 | Tobias Hennebole (from 2016-08-24) (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-05-19 | |||
37 | Kevin Heinz (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-08-12 | |||
39 | Florian Riedel (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-04-09 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Robin Binder (from 2017-01-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-10-06 | ||||
3 | Holger Lemke (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-07-22 | |||
6 | Danilo Dittrich (from 2016-07-20) (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-05-15 | |||
8 | Christoph Anton (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-08-05 | |||
10 | Patrick Lienhard (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-05-30 | |||
11 | Christian Telch (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-01-09 | |||
12 | Luka Dimitrijevic (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-12-24 | |||
14 | Daniel Kurz (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-02-06 | |||
15 | Alexander Dartsch (from 2016-08-09) (until 2017-01-25) | 1994-08-29 | |||
18 | Dominik Kinscher (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-09-20 | |||
19 | Robin Garnier (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-05-13 | |||
27 | Jonathan Zinram (from 2017-01-30) (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-12-01 | |||
31 | Petros Kaminiotis (from 2017-01-27) (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-05-13 | |||
31 | Rico Gladrow (until 2017-01-10) | 1991-04-14 | |||
32 | Lukas Billick (until 2016-08-24) | 1988-02-09 | |||
38 | Antonyos Celik (from 2017-01-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-08-20 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Sebastian Szimayer (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-05-15 | |||
9 | Muhamed Alawie (until 2017-06-11) | 1988-04-30 | |||
12 | Christos Papadimitriou (from 2017-01-07) (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-01-10 | |||
30 | Vincent Boesen (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-09-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2016-08-22 20:45 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |