Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Maik Walpurgis (from 2016-11-12) (until 2017-08-21) | 1973-10-09 | ||||
Markus Kauczinski (until 2016-11-06) | 1970-02-20 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Michael Henke (from 2016-11-08) (until 2016-11-11) | 1957-04-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Orjan Nyland (until 2018-08-07) | 1990-09-10 | |||
24 | Fabijan Buntic (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-02-24 | |||
35 | Martin Hansen (until 2017-08-30) | 1990-06-15 | |||
39 | Christian Ortag (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-01-14 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Giuseppe Leo (from 2017-01-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-01-30 | ||||
3 | Anthony Jung (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-11-03 | |||
13 | Michael Zant (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-07-15 | |||
17 | Hauke Wahl (until 2016-12-31) | 1994-04-15 | |||
18 | Romain Bregerie (until 2018-01-02) | 1986-08-09 | |||
23 | Robert Bauer (until 2016-08-23) | 1995-04-09 | |||
27 | Lukas Gerlspeck (from 2017-02-01) (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-09-27 | |||
28 | Tobias Levels (until 2018-06-30) | 1986-11-22 | |||
29 | Markus Suttner (until 2017-07-13) | 1987-04-16 | |||
32 | Marcel Tisserand (from 2016-08-31) (until 2017-08-21) | 1993-01-10 | |||
33 | Florent Hadergjonaj (from 2016-08-08) (until 2017-08-24) | 1994-07-31 | |||
34 | Marvin Matip (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-09-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Max Christiansen (from 2017-01-09) (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-09-25 | |||
6 | Alfredo Morales (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-05-12 | |||
7 | Mathew Leckie (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-02-04 | |||
8 | Roger (until 2017-06-30) | 1985-08-10 | |||
10 | Pascal Gross (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-06-15 | |||
13 | Robert Leipertz (from 2016-07-03) (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-02-01 | |||
19 | Max Christiansen (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-09-25 | |||
21 | Sonny Kittel (from 2016-07-03) (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-01-06 | |||
22 | Nico Rinderknecht (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-10-11 | |||
31 | Maurice Multhaup (until 2018-01-03) | 1996-12-15 | |||
36 | Almog Cohen (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-09-01 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Moritz Hartmann (until 2018-06-30) | 1986-06-20 | |||
11 | Dario Lezcano (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-06-30 | |||
14 | Stefan Lex (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-11-27 | |||
16 | Lukas Hinterseer (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-03-28 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Thomas Pledl (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-05-23 | ||||
Kerem Bulbul (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-01-12 | ||||
Hauke Wahl (from 2017-01-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-04-15 | ||||
Elias Kachunga (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-04-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2016-08-21 18:30 |
7 : 8 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2016-10-25 20:45 |
4 : 1 PSO |
Schema Compare |