Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Mathias Hain (until 2020-06-30) | 1972-12-31 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Ewald Lienen (until 2017-06-30) | 1953-11-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Philipp Heerwagen (until 2019-06-30) | 1983-04-13 | |||
30 | Robin Himmelmann (until 2021-01-12) | 1989-02-05 | |||
33 | Svend Brodersen (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-03-22 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Vegar Eggen Hedenstad (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-06-26 | |||
3 | Lasse Sobiech (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-01-18 | |||
4 | Philipp Ziereis (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-03-14 | |||
5 | Joel Keller (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-03-06 | |||
6 | Christopher Avevor (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-02-11 | |||
15 | Daniel Buballa (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-05-11 | |||
16 | Marc Hornschuh (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-03-02 | |||
19 | Jacob Rasmussen (until 2017-01-05) | 1997-05-28 | |||
26 | Soren Gonther (until 2017-06-30) | 1986-12-15 | |||
27 | Jan-Philipp Kalla (until 2020-06-30) | 1986-08-06 | |||
35 | Brian Koglin (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-01-07 | |||
39 | Yi-Young Park (from 2017-01-01) (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-06-29 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Bernd Nehrig (until 2019-01-05) | 1986-09-28 | |||
8 | Jeremy Dudziak (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-08-28 | |||
10 | Christopher Buchtmann (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-04-25 | |||
12 | Jakob Munzner (from 2017-01-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 2000-03-14 | |||
13 | Ryo Miyaichi (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-12-14 | |||
14 | Mats Moller Daehli (from 2017-01-17) (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-03-02 | |||
20 | Richard Neudecker (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-10-29 | |||
22 | Cenk Sahin (from 2016-07-26) (until 2019-01-25) | 1994-09-22 | |||
23 | Johannes Flum (from 2017-01-06) (until 2020-06-30) | 1987-12-14 | |||
25 | Dennis Rosin (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-06-27 | |||
28 | Waldemar Sobota (until 2020-06-30) | 1987-05-19 | |||
31 | Maurice Litka (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-01-02 | |||
40 | Christian Viet (from 2017-01-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-03-27 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Fabrice-Jean Picault (until 2017-01-31) | 1991-02-23 | |||
11 | Aziz Bouhaddouz (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-03-30 | |||
18 | Lennart Thy (from 2017-01-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-02-25 | |||
24 | Nico Empen (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-01-11 | |||
29 | Jan-Marc Schneider (from 2017-01-01) (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-03-25 | |||
34 | Marvin Ducksch (until 2017-01-10) | 1994-03-07 | |||
37 | Kyoung Rok Choi (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-03-15 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Ante Budimir (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-07-22 | ||||
Marvin Ducksch (from 2017-01-11) (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-03-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2016-08-19 20:45 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2016-10-25 20:45 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |