Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gino Lettieri (from 2017-03-07) (until 2017-06-30) | 1966-12-23 | ||||
Roland Vrabec (until 2017-03-06) | 1974-03-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jannis Pellowski (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-06-15 | |||
21 | Soren Pirson (until 2017-06-30) | 1985-08-27 | |||
29 | Matay Birol (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-08-16 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Noah Schmitt (from 2017-01-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1999-09-20 | ||||
2 | Patrick Ochs (until 2017-06-30) | 1984-05-14 | |||
3 | Christopher Schorch (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-01-30 | |||
4 | Marc Heitmeier (from 2016-07-06) (until 2017-06-30) | 1985-03-18 | |||
5 | Sebastian Schachten (until 2017-06-30) | 1984-11-06 | |||
17 | Dennis Russ (from 2017-01-05) (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-06-05 | |||
19 | Antonio Fischer (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-08-09 | |||
20 | Andrej Markovic (from 2017-01-01) (until 2019-01-29) | 1998-06-14 | |||
22 | La'Vere Corbin-Ong (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-04-22 | |||
27 | Steffen Schafer (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-05-01 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Mohamed Morabet (from 2016-12-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-01-31 | ||||
6 | Denis Streker (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-04-06 | |||
7 | Ahmed Azaouagh (from 2017-01-12) | 1994-06-20 | |||
7 | Ahmed Azaouagh (from 2017-01-12) (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-06-20 | |||
7 | Massimo Ornatelli (until 2017-06-30) | 1986-01-17 | |||
8 | Andreas Pollasch (from 2017-01-01) (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-03-04 | |||
8 | Bentley Baxter Bahn (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-08-28 | |||
10 | Milad Salem (from 2017-01-28) (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-03-03 | |||
10 | Adil Chihi (until 2017-01-04) | 1988-02-21 | |||
14 | Shawn Maurice Barry (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-04-23 | |||
20 | Fabian Burdenski (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-09-23 | |||
23 | Nahom Gebru (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-08-26 | |||
24 | Fabian Schleusener (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-10-24 | |||
25 | Mateo Andacic (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-11-16 | |||
28 | Leon Hammel (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-04-24 | |||
30 | Fabian Graudenz (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-01-16 | |||
31 | Yannick Stark (from 2016-08-03) (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-10-28 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Maziar Namavizadeh (from 2017-01-01) (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-10-28 | |||
9 | Cagatay Kader (from 2016-07-08) (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-02-25 | |||
10 | Smail Morabit (from 2017-01-03) (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-07-05 | |||
11 | Maurice Deville (from 2016-08-07) (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-07-31 | |||
17 | Stefan Maderer (until 2017-01-31) | 1996-09-01 | |||
26 | Ranisav Jovanovic (until 2017-06-30) | 1980-11-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2016-08-20 20:45 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |