Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cheftrainerin | |||||
Wolfram Eitel (until 2018-06-30) | 1976-02-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Kevin Kraus (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-02-27 | |||
30 | Clemens Frey (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-02-17 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Philipp Altmann (from 2016-08-01) (until 2017-07-30) | 1996-02-15 | ||||
Moritz Jeggle (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-05-16 | ||||
Emil Noll (until 2017-06-30) | 1978-11-21 | ||||
Olcay Gur (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-03-27 | ||||
Sebastian Mahr (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-01-30 | ||||
Jascha Fiesel (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-12-18 | ||||
Sebastian Reiner (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-02-06 | ||||
Robert Henning (until 2017-06-30) | 1985-12-07 | ||||
Manuel Litz (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-01-04 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Alexander Gorte (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-09-17 | ||||
Ralf Heimgartner (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-08-24 | ||||
Maschkour Gbadamassi (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-06-07 | ||||
Marvin Muller (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-08-10 | ||||
Harun Toprak (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-08-24 | ||||
Thomas Zimmermann (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-09-22 | ||||
Luca Gruler (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-10-25 | ||||
Jona Boneberger (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-03-14 | ||||
20 | Daniel Hortkorn (until 2017-06-30) | 1988-01-31 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Axel Maucher (until 2017-06-30) | |||||
Jonas Wiest (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-01-07 | ||||
Rahman Soyudogru (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-01-06 | ||||
Steffen Wohlfarth (until 2017-06-30) | 1983-09-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2016-08-19 20:45 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |