Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ralph Hasenhuttl (until 2018-05-16) | 1967-08-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Fabio Coltorti (until 2018-06-30) | 1980-12-03 | |||
21 | Marius Muller (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-07-12 | |||
22 | Benjamin Bellot (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-07-30 | |||
32 | Peter Gulacsi (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-05-06 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Dominik Franke (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-10-05 | ||||
3 | Bernardo (from 2016-08-28) (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-05-14 | |||
4 | Willi Orban (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-11-03 | |||
5 | Kyriakos Papadopoulos (from 2016-08-31) (until 2017-01-15) | 1992-02-23 | |||
5 | Atinc Nukan (until 2016-08-31) | 1993-07-20 | |||
6 | Ibrahima Konate (from 2017-06-12) (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-05-25 | |||
16 | Lukas Klostermann | 1996-06-03 | |||
17 | Dayot Upamecano (from 2017-01-13) (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-10-27 | |||
20 | Ken Gipson (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-02-24 | |||
20 | Benno Schmitz (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-11-17 | |||
23 | Marcel Halstenberg (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-09-27 | |||
33 | Marvin Compper (until 2017-12-31) | 1985-06-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Kamil Wojtkowski (from 2017-01-27) (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-02-26 | ||||
Patrick Strauss (from 2017-01-01) (until 2017-06-30) | 1996-01-28 | ||||
6 | Rani Khedira (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-01-27 | |||
7 | Marcel Sabitzer (until 2021-08-30) | 1994-03-17 | |||
8 | Naby Keita (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-02-10 | |||
13 | Stefan Ilsanker (until 2020-01-31) | 1989-05-18 | |||
14 | Massimo Bruno (until 2016-08-30) | 1993-09-17 | |||
24 | Dominik Kaiser (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-09-16 | |||
26 | Vitaly Janelt (until 2017-01-09) | 1998-05-10 | |||
31 | Diego Demme (until 2020-01-11) | 1991-11-21 | |||
35 | Zsolt Kalmar (until 2017-01-29) | 1995-06-09 | |||
40 | Idrissa Toure (until 2017-01-17) | 1998-04-29 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Yussuf Poulsen | 1994-06-15 | |||
10 | Emil Forsberg (until 2023-12-31) | 1991-10-23 | |||
11 | Timo Werner (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-03-06 | |||
15 | Agyemang Diawusie (until 2017-06-30) | 1998-02-12 | |||
18 | Terrence Boyd (until 2017-01-23) | 1991-02-16 | |||
19 | Oliver Burke (from 2016-08-28) (until 2017-08-25) | 1997-04-07 | |||
27 | Davie Selke (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-01-20 | |||
38 | Federico Palacios Martinez (from 2017-01-01) (until 2018-01-08) | 1995-04-09 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Massimo Bruno (from 2016-08-30) (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-09-17 | ||||
Vitaly Janelt (from 2017-01-09) (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-05-10 | ||||
Zsolt Kalmar (from 2017-01-30) (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-06-09 | ||||
Nils Quaschner (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-04-22 | ||||
Omer Damari (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-03-24 | ||||
5 | Atinc Nukan (from 2016-08-31) (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-07-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2016-08-20 15:30 |
5 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |