Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Sven Demandt (until 2017-10-01) | 1965-02-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Niclas Heimann (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-03-12 | |||
27 | Tom Gubini (until 2016-12-31) | 1996-03-27 | |||
29 | Maksimilijan Milovanovic (until 2017-06-30) | 1997-06-30 | |||
33 | Robin Heller (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-12-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
4 | Gino Windmuller (until 2017-06-30) | 1989-06-20 | |||
6 | Richard Weber (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-01-07 | |||
7 | Kevin Grund (until 2021-06-30) | 1987-08-14 | |||
18 | Dennis Malura (until 2017-06-30) | 1984-06-20 | |||
20 | Philipp Zeiger (until 2020-06-30) | 1990-06-28 | |||
21 | Patrick Huckle (until 2017-06-30) | 1983-11-04 | |||
22 | Tolga Cokkosan (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-04-06 | |||
24 | Leroy Kwadwo (until 2016-12-31) | 1996-08-15 | |||
25 | Jeffrey Obst (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-11-25 | |||
40 | Boris Tomiak (from 2017-04-01) (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-09-11 | |||
44 | Timo Becker (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-03-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jan-Steffen Meier (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-05-30 | ||||
Lucas Arenz (until 2016-06-30) | 1994-02-17 | ||||
5 | Kasim Rabihic (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-02-24 | |||
8 | Andreas Ivan (until 2017-01-04) | 1995-01-10 | |||
10 | Kai Proger (from 2017-05-22) (until 2019-01-14) | 1992-05-15 | |||
11 | Vojno Jesic (until 2017-01-18) | 1994-03-04 | |||
13 | Nico Lucas (until 2019-07-27) | 1997-08-14 | |||
17 | Emre Yesilova (until 2016-08-04) | 1993-12-30 | |||
23 | Kamil Bednarski (until 2017-06-30) | 1985-10-11 | |||
26 | Timo Brauer (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-05-30 | |||
30 | Emre Demircan (until 2017-01-25) | 1997-05-06 | |||
31 | Benjamin Baier (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-07-23 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Marcel Platzek (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-05-21 | |||
10 | Frank Loning (until 2017-06-30) | 1981-08-28 | |||
19 | Roussel Ngankam (from 2016-08-31) (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-09-15 | |||
19 | Joachim Osvold (until 2016-07-29) | 1994-09-23 | |||
34 | Kai Druschky (until 2017-01-31) | 1993-04-19 | |||
42 | Ismail Remmo (from 2017-05-20) (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-04-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2016-08-20 15:30 |
4 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |