Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bernd Hollerbach (until 2017-06-30) | 1969-12-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Dominik Brunnhubner (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-07-29 | |||
19 | Kenan Mujezinovic (until 2016-08-19) | 1995-06-03 | |||
28 | Robert Wulnikowski (until 2017-06-30) | 1977-07-11 | |||
31 | Jorg Siebenhandl (from 2016-07-26) (until 2017-06-30) | 1990-01-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Dominik Nothnagel (until 2017-01-09) | 1994-12-28 | |||
5 | Clemens Schoppenhauer (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-02-23 | |||
7 | Felix Muller (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-01-27 | |||
11 | Richard Weil (until 2017-01-29) | 1988-02-06 | |||
12 | Junior Diaz (from 2016-08-30) (until 2017-06-30) | 1983-09-12 | |||
15 | Franko Uzelac (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-11-05 | |||
16 | Peter Kurzweg (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-02-10 | |||
17 | Sascha Traut (until 2017-01-21) | 1985-05-21 | |||
22 | Dennis Russ (until 2017-01-05) | 1992-06-05 | |||
25 | David Pisot (from 2016-08-16) (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-07-06 | |||
26 | Royal-Dominique Fennell (until 2016-08-31) | 1989-06-05 | |||
29 | Sebastian Neumann (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-02-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Dennis Schmitt (until 2017-06-30) | 1993-05-27 | |||
4 | Rico Benatelli (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-03-17 | |||
6 | Tasos Lagos (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-04-12 | |||
8 | Emanuel Taffertshofer (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-02-24 | |||
9 | Amir Shapourzadeh (until 2016-12-31) | 1982-09-19 | |||
13 | Lukas Frode (from 2017-01-02) (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-01-23 | |||
14 | Joannis Karsanidis (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-06-25 | |||
17 | Sebastian Ernst (from 2017-01-30) (until 2017-06-30) | 1995-03-04 | |||
20 | Daniel Nagy (until 2017-06-30) | 1991-03-15 | |||
21 | Tobias Schrock (until 2017-06-30) | 1992-12-31 | |||
24 | Valdet Rama (from 2016-08-29) (until 2017-06-30) | 1987-11-20 | |||
25 | Bjorn Jopek (from 2017-06-13) (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-08-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
10 | Nejmeddin Daghfous (until 2017-06-30) | 1986-10-01 | |||
23 | Patrick Weihrauch (until 2017-06-30) | 1994-03-03 | |||
27 | Marco Konigs (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-01-25 | |||
33 | Elia Soriano (until 2017-07-31) | 1989-06-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2016-08-20 15:30 |
1 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2016-10-25 18:30 |
3 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |