Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Rittenauer (until 2018-06-30) | 1986-05-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Dennis Klose (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-04-10 | |||
38 | Florian Sieler (until 2018-06-30) | 1999-05-06 | |||
40 | Arek Patyk (until 2018-06-30) | 1980-10-29 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Sebastian Sauter (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-11-01 | |||
4 | Philipp Dietrich (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-05-05 | |||
6 | Kevin Kling (until 2018-06-30) | 1999-07-01 | |||
10 | Pascal Rasmus (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-11-01 | |||
19 | Moritz Strauss (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-10-04 | |||
24 | Denis Lang (until 2018-06-30) | 1985-06-24 | |||
25 | Danny Berger (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-02-17 | |||
27 | Christoph Matt (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-02-01 | |||
29 | Bjorn Unden (until 2018-06-30) | 1987-07-20 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Adrian Martic (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-03-13 | ||||
Veysel Kayantas (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-05-25 | ||||
7 | Rene Greuter (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-08-07 | |||
8 | Dominik Almeida (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-01-28 | |||
11 | Tobias Bertsch (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-10-30 | |||
13 | Johannes Niederberger (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-02-17 | |||
17 | Benjamin Winterhalder (until 2018-06-30) | 1985-05-01 | |||
20 | Sebastian Stark (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-02-04 | |||
22 | Patrick Leschinski (until 2018-06-30) | 1986-02-16 | |||
33 | Gian-Luca Wellhauser (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-10-03 | |||
44 | Christian Heller (until 2018-06-30) | 1985-08-31 | |||
Sturm | |||||
18 | Robin Niedhardt (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-12-04 | |||
21 | Fabian Mohrle (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-05-29 | |||
23 | Alen Lekavski (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-02-27 | |||
28 | Frank Stark (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-09-14 | |||
31 | Nazif Hajdarovic (until 2018-06-30) | 1984-09-22 | |||
35 | Marco Mendes (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-01-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2017-08-12 15:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |