Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gerd Klaus (until 2018-06-30) | 1970-09-02 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Alexander Eiban (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-05-05 | |||
12 | David Paulus (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-05-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Herbert Paul (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-02-11 | |||
3 | Andreas Bauer (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-03-07 | |||
4 | Kevin Baer (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-04-28 | |||
5 | Marco Janz (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-11-02 | |||
14 | Max Hillenbrand (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-04-15 | |||
17 | Matthias Strohmaier (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-03-11 | |||
21 | Dominik Weiss (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-04-17 | |||
23 | Philip Messingschlager (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-10-02 | |||
24 | Patrick Wolf (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-02-12 | |||
32 | Lukas Billick (until 2023-06-30) | 1988-02-09 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Christopher Kracun (until 2018-12-31) | 1993-02-02 | |||
7 | Marco Fritscher (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-12-27 | |||
8 | Michael Schlicht (until 2018-07-04) | 1993-11-13 | |||
10 | Lukas Kling (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-11-13 | |||
11 | Christopher Lehmann (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-10-28 | |||
15 | Kevin Fery (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-03-31 | |||
16 | Vincent Waigand (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-04-11 | |||
19 | Steffen Krautschneider (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-08-11 | |||
20 | Nikola Jelisic (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-12-29 | |||
30 | Marius Willsch (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-03-18 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Nicolas Gortler (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-03-08 | |||
20 | Florian Pieper (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-08-27 | |||
22 | Florian Pieper (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-08-27 | |||
27 | Adam Jabiri (until 2023-06-30) | 1984-06-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2017-08-13 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2017-10-24 20:45 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |