Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Andre Hofschneider (from 2017-12-04) (until 2018-06-30) | 1970-06-10 | ||||
Jens Keller (until 2017-12-04) | 1970-11-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Daniel Mesenholer (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-07-24 | |||
12 | Jakob Busk (until 2024-06-30) | 1993-09-12 | |||
20 | Lennart Moser (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-12-06 | |||
30 | Michael Gspurning (until 2018-06-30) | 1981-05-02 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Atsuto Uchida (from 2017-08-21) (until 2018-01-01) | 1988-03-27 | |||
3 | Christoph Schosswendter (from 2017-07-15) (until 2019-01-11) | 1988-07-16 | |||
5 | Marvin Friedrich (from 2018-01-27) (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-12-13 | |||
6 | Kristian Pedersen (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-08-04 | |||
15 | Marc Torrejon (until 2019-06-30) | 1986-02-18 | |||
28 | Christopher Trimmel | 1987-02-24 | |||
29 | Michael Parensen (until 2020-06-30) | 1986-06-24 | |||
33 | Lennard Maloney (from 2017-08-15) (until 2020-08-06) | 1999-10-08 | |||
34 | Fabian Schonheim (until 2019-06-30) | 1987-02-14 | |||
37 | Toni Leistner (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-08-19 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
4 | Lars Dietz (from 2018-01-03) (until 2018-08-31) | 1997-01-07 | |||
7 | Marcel Hartel (until 2019-07-26) | 1996-01-19 | |||
8 | Stephan Furstner (until 2018-06-30) | 1987-09-11 | |||
10 | Dennis Daube (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-07-11 | |||
11 | Akaki Gogia (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-01-18 | |||
18 | Kenny Redondo (until 2019-01-11) | 1994-08-29 | |||
19 | Damir Kreilach (until 2018-02-07) | 1989-04-16 | |||
21 | Grischa Promel (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-01-09 | |||
23 | Felix Kroos (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-03-12 | |||
31 | Berkan Taz (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-12-19 | |||
39 | Lukas Lammel (until 2017-08-18) | 1997-09-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Sebastian Polter (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-04-01 | |||
16 | Philipp Hosiner (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-05-15 | |||
17 | Simon Hedlund (until 2019-01-11) | 1993-03-11 | |||
24 | Steven Skrzybski (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-11-18 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Christopher Lenz (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-09-22 | ||||
Eroll Zejnullahu (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-10-19 | ||||
13 | Peter Kurzweg (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-02-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2017-08-13 15:30 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2017-10-24 18:30 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |