Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Niko Kovac (until 2018-06-30) | 1971-10-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Lukas Hradecky (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-11-24 | |||
17 | Jan Zimmermann (until 2018-06-30) | 1985-04-19 | |||
34 | Leon Batge (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-07-09 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Yanni Regasel (until 2018-03-13) | 1996-01-13 | |||
3 | Simon Falette (from 2017-08-16) (until 2020-01-08) | 1992-02-19 | |||
6 | Bastian Oczipka (until 2017-07-14) | 1989-01-12 | |||
13 | Carlos Salcedo (until 2019-01-21) | 1993-09-29 | |||
15 | Jetro Willems (from 2017-07-21) (until 2019-08-02) | 1994-03-30 | |||
19 | David Abraham (until 2021-01-17) | 1986-07-16 | |||
23 | Marco Russ (until 2020-06-30) | 1985-08-04 | |||
24 | Danny da Costa (until 2021-01-21) | 1993-07-13 | |||
26 | Deji Beyreuther (until 2018-12-31) | 1999-09-06 | |||
29 | Andersson Ordonez (until 2017-12-31) | 1994-01-29 | |||
33 | Taleb Tawatha (until 2019-08-28) | 1992-06-21 | |||
35 | Noel Knothe (until 2019-01-29) | 1999-05-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Gelson Fernandes (until 2020-06-30) | 1986-09-02 | |||
6 | Jonathan de Guzman (from 2017-07-10) (until 2020-08-31) | 1987-09-13 | |||
7 | Danny Blum (until 2018-08-26) | 1991-01-07 | |||
10 | Marco Fabian (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-07-21 | |||
11 | Mijat Gacinovic (until 2020-08-04) | 1995-02-08 | |||
17 | Kevin-Prince Boateng (from 2017-08-18) (until 2018-07-05) | 1987-03-06 | |||
18 | Max Besuschkow (until 2018-01-31) | 1997-05-31 | |||
20 | Makoto Hasebe (until 2023-06-30) | 1984-01-18 | |||
21 | Marc Stendera (until 2019-09-02) | 1995-12-10 | |||
22 | Timothy Chandler | 1990-03-29 | |||
25 | Slobodan Medojevic (until 2018-01-19) | 1990-11-20 | |||
28 | Aymen Barkok (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-05-21 | |||
30 | Sahverdi Cetin (until 2018-06-30) | 2000-09-28 | |||
37 | Miguel Blanco-Lopez (until 2018-06-30) | 1999-04-26 | |||
39 | Omar Mascarell (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-02-02 | |||
40 | Daichi Kamada (from 2017-07-06) (until 2018-08-31) | 1996-08-05 | |||
42 | Marijan Cavar (from 2018-01-19) (until 2018-08-31) | 1998-02-02 | |||
Sturm | |||||
4 | Ante Rebic (from 2017-08-31) (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-09-21 | |||
8 | Luka Jovic (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-12-23 | |||
9 | Sebastien Haller (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-06-22 | |||
14 | Alexander Meier (until 2018-06-30) | 1983-01-17 | |||
27 | Marius Wolf (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-05-27 | |||
31 | Branimir Hrgota (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-01-12 | |||
32 | Nelson Mandela Mbouhom (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-05-04 | |||
38 | Renat Dadashov (until 2018-06-11) | 1999-05-17 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Andersson Ordonez (from 2018-01-01) (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-01-29 | ||||
Max Besuschkow (from 2018-01-31) (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-05-31 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2017-08-12 15:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2017-10-24 20:45 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2017-12-20 20:45 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2018-02-07 18:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2018-04-18 20:45 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2018-05-19 20:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |