Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rudiger Rehm (until 2021-10-25) | 1978-11-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Markus Kolke (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-08-18 | |||
19 | Jan Albrecht (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-04-12 | |||
25 | Lukas Watkowiak (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-03-06 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
4 | Sascha Mockenhaupt (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-09-10 | |||
5 | Soren Reddemann (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-05-16 | |||
6 | Patrick Funk (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-02-11 | |||
13 | Vladimir Kovac (until 2018-01-23) | 1991-04-29 | |||
16 | Niklas Dams (until 2020-08-04) | 1990-05-28 | |||
18 | Steven Ruprecht (until 2018-06-30) | 1987-06-24 | |||
20 | Moritz Kuhn (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-08-01 | |||
22 | Michael Akoto (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-10-03 | |||
29 | Dominik Nothnagel (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-12-28 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Paul Lutterbuse (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-01-29 | ||||
7 | Philipp Muller (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-03-03 | |||
8 | David Blacha (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-10-22 | |||
10 | Robert Andrich (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-09-22 | |||
14 | Jules Schwadorf (until 2020-06-30) | 1992-10-19 | |||
17 | Kevin Pezzoni (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-03-22 | |||
23 | Alf Mintzel (until 2019-06-30) | 1981-12-21 | |||
24 | Jeremias Lorch (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-12-02 | |||
26 | Patrick Breitkreuz (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-01-18 | |||
28 | Nils-Ole Book (until 2018-06-30) | 1986-02-17 | |||
28 | Max Dittgen (from 2017-08-08) (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-03-03 | |||
33 | Sebastian Mrowca (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-01-16 | |||
37 | Stephan Andrist (until 2019-01-26) | 1987-12-12 | |||
39 | Evans Nyarko (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-07-06 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Manuel Schaffler (until 2020-06-30) | 1989-02-06 | |||
11 | Agyemang Diawusie (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-02-12 | |||
27 | Simon Brandstetter (from 2018-01-02) (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-05-02 | |||
30 | Dominik Martinovic (from 2018-01-02) (until 2018-12-31) | 1997-03-25 | |||
36 | Stephane Mvibudulu (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-05-18 | |||
verliehen | |||||
21 | Jann Bangert (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-04-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2017-08-13 18:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2017-10-24 18:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |