Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Tayfun Korkut (from 2018-01-29) (until 2018-10-07) | 1974-04-02 | ||||
Hannes Wolf (until 2018-01-28) | 1981-04-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Mitchell Langerak (until 2017-08-30) | 1988-08-22 | |||
13 | Jens Grahl (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-09-22 | |||
16 | Ron-Robert Zieler (until 2018-06-06) | 1989-02-12 | |||
26 | Alexander Meyer (from 2017-08-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-04-13 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Emiliano Insua (until 2020-01-02) | 1989-01-07 | |||
4 | Jerome Onguene (until 2017-08-30) | 1997-12-22 | |||
5 | Timo Baumgartl (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-03-04 | |||
6 | Jean Zimmer (until 2017-08-09) | 1993-12-06 | |||
21 | Benjamin Pavard (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-03-28 | |||
25 | Matthias Zimmermann (until 2018-07-16) | 1992-06-16 | |||
28 | Holger Badstuber (from 2017-08-04) (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-03-13 | |||
29 | Ailton (from 2017-07-18) (until 2018-01-25) | 1995-03-16 | |||
32 | Andreas Beck (from 2017-08-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 1987-03-13 | |||
35 | Marcin Kaminski (until 2018-08-24) | 1992-01-15 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Dennis Aogo (from 2017-08-09) (until 2019-06-30) | 1987-01-14 | |||
6 | Santiago Ascacibar (from 2017-08-22) (until 2019-12-31) | 1997-02-25 | |||
8 | Anto Grgic (until 2018-01-11) | 1996-11-28 | |||
15 | Carlos Mane (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-03-11 | |||
17 | Erik Thommy (from 2018-01-18) (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-08-20 | |||
17 | Tobias Werner (until 2017-08-28) | 1985-07-19 | |||
18 | Hans Nunoo Sarpei (until 2017-09-05) | 1998-08-22 | |||
19 | Chadrac Akolo (until 2019-07-30) | 1995-04-01 | |||
20 | Christian Gentner (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-08-14 | |||
22 | Ebenezer Ofori (until 2018-02-20) | 1995-07-01 | |||
23 | Orel Mangala (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-03-18 | |||
24 | Dzenis Burnic (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-05-22 | |||
31 | Berkay Ozcan (until 2019-01-24) | 1998-02-15 | |||
39 | Nicolas Sessa (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-03-23 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Pascal Breier (until 2017-12-31) | 1992-02-02 | ||||
Boris Taschtschi (until 2017-07-03) | 1993-07-26 | ||||
7 | Josip Brekalo (until 2017-12-22) | 1998-06-23 | |||
9 | Simon Terodde (until 2017-12-31) | 1988-03-02 | |||
11 | Takuma Asano (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-11-10 | |||
14 | Anastasios Donis (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-08-29 | |||
27 | Mario Gomez (from 2017-12-22) (until 2020-06-30) | 1985-07-10 | |||
33 | Daniel Ginczek (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-04-13 | |||
34 | Jacob Bruun Larsen (from 2018-01-23) (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-09-19 | |||
37 | Julian Green (until 2017-08-30) | 1995-06-06 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Anto Grgic (from 2018-01-11) (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-11-28 | ||||
Ailton (from 2018-01-25) (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-03-16 | ||||
Ebenezer Ofori (from 2018-02-21) (until 2018-12-31) | 1995-07-01 | ||||
Jan Kliment (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-09-01 | ||||
Jean Zimmer (from 2017-08-10) (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-12-06 | ||||
Julian Green (from 2017-08-31) (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-06-06 | ||||
Jerome Onguene (from 2017-08-31) (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-12-22 | ||||
17 | Tobias Werner (from 2017-08-28) (until 2018-06-30) | 1985-07-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2017-08-13 18:30 |
3 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2017-10-25 18:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2017-12-19 18:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |