Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Daniel Thioune (from 2017-11-08) (until 2020-06-30) | 1974-07-21 | ||||
Joe Enochs (until 2017-10-04) | 1971-09-01 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Daniel Thioune (from 2017-10-05) (until 2017-11-07) | 1974-07-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Tim Paterok (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-08-05 | |||
21 | Marius Gersbeck (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-06-20 | |||
22 | Leon Tigges (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-07-31 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Marcel Ruschmeier (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-08-20 | |||
3 | Furkan Zorba (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-02-25 | |||
4 | Marcel Appiah (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-03-26 | |||
5 | Konstantin Engel (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-07-27 | |||
6 | Alexander Dercho (until 2019-06-30) | 1987-01-21 | |||
7 | Bashkim Renneke (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-12-10 | |||
16 | Marc Wachs (from 2017-08-24) (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-07-10 | |||
17 | Adam Susac (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-05-20 | |||
27 | Kim Falkenberg (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-04-10 | |||
28 | Tim Moller (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-03-19 | |||
30 | Nazim Sangare (until 2017-08-30) | 1994-05-30 | |||
37 | Stephen Sama (from 2018-01-29) (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-03-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
8 | Bastian Schulz (until 2018-01-03) | 1985-07-10 | |||
9 | Marcos Alvarez (from 2017-08-04) (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-09-30 | |||
10 | Christian Gross (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-02-08 | |||
13 | Tim Danneberg (until 2019-06-30) | 1986-04-23 | |||
14 | Ahmet Arslan (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-03-30 | |||
15 | Jules Reimerink (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-09-30 | |||
23 | Christian Bickel (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-01-27 | |||
26 | Sebastian Klaas (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-06-30 | |||
29 | Kamer Krasniqi (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-01-11 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Jannik Tepe (from 2018-01-01) (until 2018-06-30) | 1999-01-01 | ||||
8 | Utku Sen (from 2018-01-31) (until 2018-06-30) | 1998-06-15 | |||
9 | Halil Savran (until 2018-06-30) | 1985-06-20 | |||
11 | Kwasi Wriedt (until 2017-08-03) | 1994-07-10 | |||
14 | Ahmet Arslan (until 2018-08-08) | 1994-03-30 | |||
18 | Robert Kristo (until 2018-06-30) | 1993-05-14 | |||
19 | Steffen Tigges (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-07-31 | |||
20 | Marc Heider (until 2023-06-30) | 1986-05-18 | |||
25 | Emmanuel Iyoha (from 2017-08-24) (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-10-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2017-08-13 15:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2017-10-25 18:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |