Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Florian Kohfeldt (from 2018-01-01) (until 2021-05-15) | 1982-10-05 | ||||
Alexander Nouri (until 2017-10-30) | 1979-08-20 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Florian Kohfeldt (from 2017-10-30) (until 2017-12-31) | 1982-10-05 | ||||
Teammanager | |||||
Tim Barten (until 2021-06-30) | 1976-08-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Michael Zetterer (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-07-12 | ||||
1 | Jiri Pavlenka (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-04-14 | |||
1 | Jiri Pavlenka (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-04-14 | |||
30 | Michael Zetterer (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-07-12 | |||
33 | Jaroslav Drobny (until 2019-01-14) | 1979-10-18 | |||
43 | Eric Oelschlagel (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-09-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Luca Caldirola (until 2019-01-30) | 1991-02-01 | |||
4 | Robert Bauer (until 2018-06-30) | 1995-04-09 | |||
5 | Ludwig Augustinsson (until 2021-08-30) | 1994-04-21 | |||
13 | Milos Veljkovic | 1995-09-26 | |||
13 | Milos Veljkovic (until 2023-06-30) | 1995-09-26 | |||
15 | Sebastian Langkamp (from 2018-01-31) (until 2020-07-06) | 1988-01-15 | |||
18 | Niklas Moisander (until 2021-06-30) | 1985-09-29 | |||
20 | Ulisses Garcia (until 2018-01-04) | 1996-01-11 | |||
23 | Theodor Gebre Selassie (until 2021-06-30) | 1986-12-24 | |||
26 | Lamine Sane (until 2018-02-20) | 1987-03-22 | |||
28 | Jesper Verlaat (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-06-04 | |||
32 | Marco Friedl (from 2018-01-25) (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-03-16 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Nuri Sahin (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-09-05 | ||||
6 | Thomas Delaney (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-09-03 | |||
7 | Florian Kainz (until 2019-01-18) | 1992-10-24 | |||
8 | Jerome Gondorf (until 2018-06-30) | 1988-06-26 | |||
14 | Ole Kauper (from 2017-09-21) (until 2019-01-06) | 1997-01-09 | |||
15 | Izet Hajrovic (until 2018-01-31) | 1991-08-04 | |||
16 | Zlatko Junuzovic (until 2018-06-30) | 1987-09-26 | |||
22 | Fin Bartels (until 2020-07-06) | 1987-02-07 | |||
24 | Johannes Eggestein (until 2020-10-05) | 1998-05-08 | |||
25 | Thanos Petsos (until 2017-08-30) | 1991-06-05 | |||
34 | Sambou Yatabare (until 2017-08-30) | 1989-02-03 | |||
35 | Maximilian Eggestein (until 2021-08-17) | 1996-12-08 | |||
38 | Niklas Schmidt (until 2018-07-24) | 1998-03-01 | |||
41 | Levent Aycicek (until 2017-08-30) | 1994-02-12 | |||
44 | Philipp Bargfrede (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-03-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Joshua Sargent (from 2018-01-01) (until 2018-06-30) | 2000-02-20 | ||||
9 | Aron Johannsson (until 2018-06-30) | 1990-11-10 | |||
10 | Max Kruse (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-03-19 | |||
11 | Milot Rashica (from 2018-01-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-06-28 | |||
17 | Justin Eilers (until 2018-06-11) | 1988-06-13 | |||
19 | Yuning Zhang (from 2017-07-04) (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-01-05 | |||
29 | Ishak Belfodil (from 2017-08-31) (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-01-12 | |||
47 | Ousman Manneh (until 2018-06-30) | 1997-03-10 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Luca Zander (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-08-09 | ||||
Lennart Thy (from 2017-07-19) (until 2018-06-30) | 1992-02-25 | ||||
Fallou Diagne (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-08-14 | ||||
Leon Guwara (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-06-28 | ||||
Laszlo Kleinheisler (until 2018-06-30) | 1994-04-08 | ||||
Thanos Petsos (from 2017-08-31) (until 2018-06-30) | 1991-06-05 | ||||
Sambou Yatabare (from 2017-08-31) (until 2018-06-30) | 1989-02-03 | ||||
Ulisses Garcia (from 2018-01-05) (until 2018-06-30) | 1996-01-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2017-08-12 20:45 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2017-10-25 20:45 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2017-12-20 18:30 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2018-02-06 20:45 |
4 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |