Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gökhan Gökce (until 2019-06-30) | 1984-01-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Manuel Salz (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-08-06 | |||
12 | Stavros Eirinikos (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-05-27 | |||
33 | Niclas Mummert (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-05-11 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Bogdan Alexandru Cristescu (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-02-27 | |||
4 | Zvonimir Borac (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-09-22 | |||
5 | Akiyoshi Saito (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-02-19 | |||
20 | Robert Stark (until 2019-06-30) | 1986-11-06 | |||
23 | Fatih Özge (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-10-11 | |||
24 | Vittorio Cali (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-03-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Arber Beqiri (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-03-27 | ||||
Jan Mörgenthaler (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-04-06 | ||||
6 | Serach von Nordheim (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-02-17 | |||
8 | Denis Gudzevic (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-12-02 | |||
10 | Kushtrim Lushtaku (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-10-08 | |||
14 | Julian Grupp (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-07-29 | |||
40 | Georgios Doufas (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-01-21 | |||
42 | Laurin Masurica (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-09-08 | |||
81 | Fatih Ceylan (until 2019-06-30) | 1980-11-25 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Christopher Dittrich (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-12-15 | ||||
2 | Alan Delic (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-06-06 | |||
7 | Jonathan Zinram (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-12-01 | |||
9 | Kreshnik Lushtaku (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-07-20 | |||
11 | Joao Tardelli (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-07-26 | |||
13 | Dominik Salz (until 2019-06-30) | 1987-07-12 | |||
17 | Tim Oman (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-04-03 | |||
27 | Daisuke Ando (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-07-18 | |||
57 | Stanley Ratifo (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-12-05 | |||
77 | Sadik Yilmaz (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-07-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2018-08-18 15:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |