Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Michael Oenning (from 2018-11-14) (until 2019-06-30) | 1965-09-27 | ||||
Jens Hartel (until 2018-11-12) | 1969-06-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Giorgi Loria (from 2019-01-18) (until 2019-06-30) | 1986-01-27 | ||||
1 | Jasmin Fejzic (until 2019-01-06) | 1986-05-15 | |||
12 | Mario Seidel (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-01-19 | |||
30 | Alexander Brunst-Zollner (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-07-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Romain Bregerie (from 2018-08-27) (until 2019-06-30) | 1986-08-09 | ||||
3 | Christopher Handke (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-02-14 | |||
4 | Jan Kirchhoff (from 2019-01-03) (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-10-01 | |||
5 | Tobias Muller (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-07-08 | |||
9 | Marcel Costly (until 2020-07-05) | 1995-11-20 | |||
10 | Nico Hammann (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-03-16 | |||
13 | Dennis Erdmann (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-11-22 | |||
14 | Steffen Schafer (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-05-01 | |||
16 | Nils Butzen (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-04-02 | |||
17 | Richard Weil (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-02-06 | |||
18 | Aleksandar Ignjovski (until 2019-07-20) | 1991-01-27 | |||
20 | Joel Abu Hanna (until 2019-01-16) | 1998-01-22 | |||
29 | Timo Perthel (from 2019-01-03) (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-02-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Bjorn Rother (until 2020-07-05) | 1996-07-29 | |||
8 | Philip Turpitz (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-08-23 | |||
19 | Michel Niemeyer (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-11-19 | |||
21 | Rico Preissinger (until 2020-07-05) | 1996-07-21 | |||
22 | Manfred Osei Kwadwo (until 2020-07-05) | 1995-05-30 | |||
23 | Charles Elie Laprevotte (until 2020-07-05) | 1992-10-04 | |||
24 | Tarek Chahed (until 2020-07-05) | 1996-06-23 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Felix Lohkemper (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-01-26 | |||
11 | Christian Beck (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-03-10 | |||
25 | Philipp Harant (until 2019-01-06) | 1999-02-20 | |||
27 | Steven Lewerenz (from 2019-01-05) (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-05-18 | |||
37 | Mergim Berisha (until 2018-12-31) | 1998-05-11 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Leon Heynke (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-11-27 | ||||
Philipp Harant (from 2019-01-06) (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-02-20 | ||||
Joel Abu Hanna (from 2019-01-16) (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-01-22 | ||||
26 | Marius Bulter (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-03-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2018-08-17 20:45 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |