Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Lucien Favre (until 2020-12-13) | 1957-11-02 | ||||
Manfred Stefes (from 2019-02-09) (until 2019-02-09) | 1967-03-28 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Edin Terzic (until 2020-06-30) | 1982-10-30 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Roman Burki (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-11-14 | |||
35 | Marwin Hitz (until 2022-06-30) | 1987-09-18 | |||
40 | Eric Oelschlagel (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-09-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Dan-Axel Zagadou (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-06-03 | |||
4 | Abdou Diallo (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-05-04 | |||
5 | Achraf Hakimi (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-11-04 | |||
15 | Jeremy Toljan (until 2019-01-31) | 1994-08-08 | |||
16 | Manuel Akanji (until 2022-08-31) | 1995-07-19 | |||
18 | Leonardo Balerdi (from 2019-01-14) (until 2020-07-22) | 1999-01-26 | |||
26 | Lukasz Piszczek (until 2021-06-30) | 1985-06-03 | |||
29 | Marcel Schmelzer (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-01-22 | |||
36 | Omer Toprak (until 2019-08-10) | 1989-07-21 | |||
37 | Erik Durm (until 2018-07-12) | 1992-05-12 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Marco Rente (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-02-25 | ||||
6 | Thomas Delaney (until 2021-08-25) | 1991-09-03 | |||
7 | Jadon Sancho (until 2021-07-23) | 2000-03-25 | |||
8 | Nuri Sahin (until 2018-08-31) | 1988-09-05 | |||
10 | Mario Gotze (until 2020-06-30) | 1992-06-03 | |||
13 | Raphael Guerreiro (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-12-22 | |||
17 | Sergio Gomez (until 2019-08-11) | 2000-09-04 | |||
18 | Sebastian Rode (until 2018-12-27) | 1990-10-11 | |||
19 | Mahmoud Dahoud (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-01-01 | |||
23 | Shinji Kagawa (until 2019-01-31) | 1989-03-17 | |||
27 | Marius Wolf (until 2019-09-02) | 1995-05-27 | |||
28 | Axel Witsel (from 2018-08-06) (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-01-12 | |||
32 | Dzenis Burnic (until 2019-01-31) | 1998-05-22 | |||
33 | Julian Weigl (until 2020-01-01) | 1995-09-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Paco Alcacer (from 2018-08-28) (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-08-30 | |||
9 | Andrij Jarmolenko (until 2018-07-11) | 1989-10-23 | |||
11 | Marco Reus (until 2024-06-30) | 1989-05-31 | |||
14 | Alexander Isak (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-09-21 | |||
20 | Maximilian Philipp (until 2019-08-09) | 1994-03-01 | |||
21 | Andre Schurrle (until 2018-07-25) | 1990-11-06 | |||
22 | Christian Pulisic (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-09-18 | |||
34 | Jacob Bruun Larsen (until 2020-01-31) | 1998-09-19 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Leonardo Balerdi (from 2019-01-14) (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-01-26 | ||||
Felix Passlack (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-05-29 | ||||
Dzenis Burnic (from 2019-01-31) (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-05-22 | ||||
Andre Schurrle (from 2018-07-26) (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-11-06 | ||||
Sebastian Rode (from 2018-12-27) (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-10-11 | ||||
Shinji Kagawa (from 2019-01-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-03-17 | ||||
14 | Alexander Isak (from 2019-01-25) (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-09-21 | |||
15 | Jeremy Toljan (from 2019-01-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-08-08 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2018-08-20 20:45 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2018-10-31 18:30 |
3 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2019-02-05 20:45 |
2 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |