Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Claus-Dieter Wollitz (until 2019-12-31) | 1965-07-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Avdo Spahic (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-02-12 | |||
31 | Kevin Rauhut (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-12-30 | |||
41 | Tim Stawecki (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-08-13 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Luke Hemmerich (from 2019-01-30) (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-02-09 | |||
3 | Andrey Startsev (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-06-07 | |||
4 | Philipp Knechtel (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-06-28 | |||
5 | Jose-Junior Matuwila (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-09-20 | |||
12 | Fabian Holthaus (from 2018-10-17) (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-01-17 | |||
15 | Malte Karbstein (until 2018-08-29) | 1998-01-30 | |||
16 | Robert Muller (from 2019-01-27) (until 2020-06-30) | 1986-11-12 | |||
18 | Daniel Stanese (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-01-21 | |||
21 | Marc Stein (until 2019-01-21) | 1985-07-07 | |||
22 | Lasse Schluter (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-04-27 | |||
24 | Max Grundmann (until 2019-01-31) | 1998-08-16 | |||
25 | Marcel Baude (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-10-05 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Jonas Zickert (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-08-25 | |||
7 | Kevin Weidlich (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-10-04 | |||
8 | Felix Geisler (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-03-20 | |||
10 | Fabio Viteritti (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-05-22 | |||
13 | Paul Gehrmann (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-04-28 | |||
14 | Marcelo de Freitas (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-06-01 | |||
17 | Maximilian Zimmer (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-07-10 | |||
19 | Fabian Graudenz (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-01-16 | |||
20 | Tim Kruse (until 2019-06-30) | 1983-01-10 | |||
21 | Daniel Bohl (from 2019-01-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-06-09 | |||
23 | Lars Bender (from 2018-09-21) (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-01-08 | |||
27 | Bjorn Ziegenbein (until 2019-06-30) | 1986-04-30 | |||
28 | Niklas Geisler (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-12-10 | |||
29 | Leon Schneider (until 2019-08-01) | 2000-06-19 | |||
34 | Colin Raak (from 2019-01-01) (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-04-21 | |||
35 | Jurgen Gjasula (from 2019-01-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-12-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Kevin Scheidhauer (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-02-13 | |||
11 | Streli Mamba (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-06-17 | |||
27 | Abdulkadir Beyazit (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-11-04 | |||
33 | Moritz Broschinski (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-09-23 | |||
38 | Dimitar Rangelow (from 2018-10-18) (until 2019-06-30) | 1983-02-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2018-08-20 18:30 |
3 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |