Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Daniel Meyer (until 2019-08-19) | 1979-09-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Martin Mannel | 1988-03-16 | |||
26 | Robert Jendrusch (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-05-28 | |||
34 | Daniel Haas (until 2020-06-30) | 1983-08-01 | |||
35 | Maximilian Schlosser (until 2019-07-21) | 1999-02-14 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Jan Král (from 2019-01-28) (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-04-05 | |||
4 | Fabian Kalig (until 2021-06-30) | 1993-03-28 | |||
6 | Luke Hemmerich (until 2019-01-30) | 1998-02-09 | |||
12 | Steve Breitkreuz (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-01-18 | |||
15 | Dennis Kempe (until 2020-06-30) | 1986-06-24 | |||
18 | Nicolai Rapp (until 2019-01-12) | 1996-12-13 | |||
20 | Calogero Rizzuto (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-01-05 | |||
21 | Malcolm Cacutalua (until 2022-06-30) | 1994-11-15 | |||
27 | Sascha Hartel (until 2019-01-24) | 1999-03-09 | |||
36 | Filip Kusic (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-06-03 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Clemens Fandrich (until 2022-06-30) | 1991-01-10 | |||
7 | Jan Hochscheidt (until 2022-06-30) | 1987-10-04 | |||
8 | Tom Baumgart (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-11-12 | |||
13 | Louis Samson (from 2019-01-04) (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-07-03 | |||
14 | Ole Kauper (from 2019-01-06) (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-01-09 | |||
16 | Mario Kvesic (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-01-12 | |||
17 | Philipp Riese (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-11-12 | |||
23 | Soren Bertram (until 2019-01-10) | 1991-06-05 | |||
24 | Patrick Strauss (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-01-28 | |||
25 | Dominik Wydra (until 2020-07-09) | 1994-03-21 | |||
30 | Elias Löder (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-04-25 | |||
33 | Christian Tiffert (until 2019-01-27) | 1982-02-18 | |||
39 | Paul Horschig (from 2019-01-01) (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-03-01 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Emmanuel Iyoha (from 2018-07-16) (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-10-11 | |||
10 | Dimitrij Nazarov (until 2023-06-30) | 1990-04-04 | |||
11 | Florian Kruger (from 2018-08-07) (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-02-13 | |||
14 | Maximilian Pronichev (from 2018-07-30) (until 2019-01-04) | 1997-11-17 | |||
19 | Philipp Zulechner (from 2019-01-30) (until 2020-06-30) | 1990-04-12 | |||
37 | Pascal Testroet (from 2018-08-07) (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-09-26 | |||
38 | Robert Herrmann (until 2019-08-15) | 1993-08-10 | |||
40 | Albert Bunjaku (until 2018-08-10) | 1983-11-29 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Sascha Hartel (from 2019-01-24) (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-03-09 | ||||
Luke Hemmerich (from 2019-01-30) (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-02-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2018-08-18 18:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |