Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Interimstrainer | |||||
Huub Stevens (from 2019-03-14) (until 2019-06-30) | 1953-11-29 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Domenico Tedesco (until 2019-03-14) | 1985-09-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Ralf Fahrmann (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-09-27 | |||
34 | Michael Langer (until 2024-06-30) | 1985-01-06 | |||
35 | Alexander Nubel (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-09-30 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
George Timotheou (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-07-29 | ||||
3 | Hamza Mendyl (from 2018-08-17) (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-10-21 | |||
4 | Benedikt Howedes (until 2018-07-31) | 1988-02-29 | |||
5 | Matija Nastasic (until 2021-08-21) | 1993-03-28 | |||
14 | Abdul Rahman Baba (until 2019-01-28) | 1994-07-02 | |||
17 | Benjamin Stambouli (until 2021-06-30) | 1990-08-13 | |||
20 | Thilo Kehrer (until 2018-08-16) | 1996-09-21 | |||
21 | Sascha Riether (until 2019-06-30) | 1983-03-23 | |||
24 | Bastian Oczipka (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-01-12 | |||
26 | Salif Sane (until 2022-06-30) | 1990-08-25 | |||
27 | Jeffrey Bruma (from 2019-01-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-11-13 | |||
29 | Naldo (until 2019-01-03) | 1982-09-10 | |||
42 | Jonas Carls (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-03-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Weston McKennie (until 2020-08-30) | 1998-08-28 | |||
6 | Omar Mascarell (until 2021-08-22) | 1993-02-02 | |||
8 | Suat Serdar (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-04-11 | |||
10 | Nabil Bentaleb (until 2020-01-21) | 1994-11-24 | |||
13 | Sebastian Rudy (from 2018-08-27) (until 2019-07-31) | 1990-02-28 | |||
18 | Daniel Caligiuri (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-01-15 | |||
25 | Amine Harit (until 2021-09-01) | 1997-06-18 | |||
28 | Alessandro Schopf (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-02-07 | |||
39 | Benjamin Goller (from 2018-08-11) (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-01-01 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Nassim Boujellab (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-06-20 | ||||
Donis Avdijaj (until 2018-08-16) | 1996-08-25 | ||||
7 | Mark Uth (until 2020-01-03) | 1991-08-24 | |||
9 | Franco Di Santo (until 2019-01-31) | 1989-04-07 | |||
11 | Jewhen Konopljanka (until 2019-09-02) | 1989-09-29 | |||
14 | Rabbi Matondo (from 2019-01-30) (until 2021-01-07) | 2000-09-09 | |||
15 | Ahmed Kutucu (until 2021-01-20) | 2000-03-01 | |||
19 | Guido Burgstaller (until 2020-09-30) | 1989-04-24 | |||
22 | Steven Skrzybski (until 2020-01-03) | 1992-11-18 | |||
23 | Cedric Teuchert (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-01-14 | |||
32 | Bernard Tekpetey (until 2018-07-24) | 1997-09-03 | |||
36 | Breel Embolo (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-02-14 | |||
40 | Haji Wright (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-03-27 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Pablo Insua (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-09-09 | ||||
Fabian Reese (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-11-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2018-08-17 20:45 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2018-10-31 18:30 |
5 : 6 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2019-02-06 20:45 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2019-04-03 20:45 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |