Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Friedhelm Funkel (until 2020-01-29) | 1953-12-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Maduka Okoye (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-08-28 | ||||
1 | Michael Rensing (until 2020-06-30) | 1984-05-14 | |||
12 | Jannick Theissen (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-01-07 | |||
30 | Raphael Wolf (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-06-06 | |||
38 | Tim Wiesner (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-11-21 | |||
40 | Jaroslav Drobny (from 2019-01-14) (until 2019-06-30) | 1979-10-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Marcin Kaminski (from 2018-08-24) (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-01-15 | ||||
Markus Suttner (from 2019-01-17) (until 2019-06-30) | 1987-04-16 | ||||
3 | Andre Hoffmann | 1993-02-28 | |||
5 | Kaan Ayhan (until 2020-08-16) | 1994-11-10 | |||
18 | Gokhan Gul (until 2019-01-22) | 1998-07-17 | |||
23 | Niko Giesselmann (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-09-26 | |||
24 | Georgios Siadas (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-12-27 | |||
25 | Matthias Zimmermann (from 2018-07-16) | 1992-06-16 | |||
26 | Diego Contento (until 2020-06-30) | 1990-05-01 | |||
32 | Robin Bormuth (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-09-19 | |||
36 | Anderson-Lenda Lucoqui (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-07-06 | |||
39 | Jean Zimmer (until 2021-01-11) | 1993-12-06 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Alfredo Morales (until 2021-04-06) | 1990-05-12 | |||
7 | Oliver Fink (until 2020-06-30) | 1982-06-06 | |||
8 | Aymen Barkok (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-05-21 | |||
13 | Adam Bodzek (until 2024-06-30) | 1985-09-07 | |||
19 | Davor Lovren (until 2020-01-09) | 1998-10-03 | |||
20 | Dodi Lukebakio (from 2018-07-22) (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-09-24 | |||
22 | Kevin Stoger (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-08-27 | |||
27 | Taylan Duman (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-07-30 | |||
31 | Marcel Sobottka | 1994-04-25 | |||
33 | Takashi Usami (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-05-06 | |||
40 | Kianz Froese (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-04-16 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Benito Raman (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-11-07 | |||
10 | Marvin Ducksch (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-03-07 | |||
11 | Kenan Karaman (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-03-05 | |||
16 | Havard Nielsen (until 2019-01-07) | 1993-07-15 | |||
21 | Emir Kujovic (until 2019-08-12) | 1988-06-22 | |||
27 | Dawid Kownacki (from 2019-01-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-03-14 | |||
28 | Rouwen Hennings (until 2023-06-30) | 1987-08-28 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Emmanuel Iyoha (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-10-11 | ||||
Gokhan Gul (from 2019-01-22) (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-07-17 | ||||
Johannes Buhler (from 2019-01-09) (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-07-26 | ||||
16 | Havard Nielsen (from 2019-01-08) (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-07-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2018-08-19 15:30 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2018-10-30 18:30 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2019-02-06 20:45 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |