Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Pal Dardai (until 2019-06-30) | 1976-03-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Thomas Kraft (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-07-22 | |||
12 | Dennis Smarsch (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-01-14 | |||
22 | Rune Jarstein (until 2023-06-30) | 1984-09-29 | |||
33 | Jonathan Klinsmann (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-04-08 | |||
35 | Marius Gersbeck (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-06-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Peter Pekarik (until 2024-06-30) | 1986-10-30 | |||
4 | Karim Rekik (until 2020-10-04) | 1994-12-02 | |||
5 | Niklas Stark (until 2022-06-30) | 1995-04-14 | |||
13 | Lukas Klunter (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-05-26 | |||
17 | Maximilian Mittelstadt (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-03-18 | |||
21 | Marvin Plattenhardt (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-01-26 | |||
25 | Jordan Torunarigha (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-08-07 | |||
29 | Florian Baak (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-03-18 | |||
31 | Derrick Luckassen (from 2018-08-28) (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-07-03 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Kevin Sessa | 2000-07-06 | ||||
3 | Per Skjelbred (until 2020-06-30) | 1987-06-16 | |||
6 | Vladimir Darida (until 2022-12-30) | 1990-08-08 | |||
7 | Alexander Esswein (until 2018-12-22) | 1990-03-25 | |||
10 | Ondrej Duda (until 2020-01-12) | 1994-12-15 | |||
11 | Mathew Leckie (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-02-04 | |||
15 | Marko Grujic (from 2018-08-19) (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-04-13 | |||
16 | Javairo Dilrosun (until 2021-08-31) | 1998-06-22 | |||
18 | Santiago Ascacibar (from 2019-01-01) (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-02-25 | |||
18 | Sinan Kurt (until 2019-01-30) | 1996-07-23 | |||
26 | Arne Maier (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-01-08 | |||
28 | Fabian Lustenberger (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-05-02 | |||
30 | Julius Kade (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-05-20 | |||
34 | Maurice Covic (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-04-17 | |||
35 | Sidney Friede (until 2019-01-17) | 1998-04-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Salomon Kalou (until 2020-06-30) | 1985-08-05 | |||
14 | Pascal Kopke (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-09-03 | |||
19 | Vedad Ibisevic (until 2020-06-30) | 1984-08-06 | |||
20 | Valentino Lazaro (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-03-24 | |||
27 | Davie Selke (until 2020-01-31) | 1995-01-20 | |||
31 | Maximilian Pronichev (until 2018-07-30) | 1997-11-17 | |||
32 | Dennis Jastrzembski (until 2020-01-30) | 2000-02-20 | |||
32 | Palko Dardai (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-04-24 | |||
36 | Muhammed Kiprit (until 2019-02-06) | 1999-07-09 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Nils Korber (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-11-13 | ||||
Maximilian Pronichev (from 2018-07-30) (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-11-17 | ||||
Alexander Esswein (from 2018-12-22) (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-03-25 | ||||
Muhammed Kiprit (from 2019-02-06) (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-07-09 | ||||
35 | Sidney Friede (from 2019-01-17) (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-04-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2018-08-20 18:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2018-10-30 18:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2019-02-06 20:45 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |