Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Tim Walter (until 2019-06-30) | 1975-11-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Timon Weiner (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-01-18 | |||
18 | Kenneth Kronholm (until 2019-05-07) | 1985-10-14 | |||
35 | Dominik Reimann (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-06-18 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Arne Sicker (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-04-17 | |||
3 | Dominik Schmidt (until 2020-06-30) | 1987-07-01 | |||
4 | Yann-Aurel Bisseck (from 2019-01-17) (until 2019-08-21) | 2000-11-29 | |||
5 | Stefan Thesker (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-04-11 | |||
6 | David Kinsombi (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-12-12 | |||
15 | Johannes van den Bergh (until 2021-06-30) | 1986-11-21 | |||
17 | Patrick Kammerbauer (from 2019-01-28) (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-02-11 | |||
19 | Patrick Herrmann (until 2019-01-29) | 1988-03-16 | |||
20 | Jannik Dehm (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-05-02 | |||
24 | Hauke Wahl (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-04-15 | |||
29 | Tobias Fleckstein (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-04-24 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
7 | Jae-Sung Lee (from 2018-07-26) (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-08-10 | |||
8 | Alexander Muhling (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-09-05 | |||
11 | Manuel Janzer (until 2018-08-31) | 1992-03-07 | |||
14 | Dominic Peitz (until 2019-01-17) | 1984-09-11 | |||
16 | Philipp Sander (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-02-21 | |||
21 | Tim Siedschlag (until 2020-06-30) | 1987-09-26 | |||
22 | Atakan Karazor (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-10-13 | |||
25 | Laszlo Benes (from 2019-01-29) (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-09-09 | |||
26 | Jonas Meffert (from 2018-07-29) (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-09-04 | |||
27 | Kingsley Schindler (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-07-12 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Franck Evina (from 2019-01-03) (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-07-05 | ||||
Masaya Okugawa (from 2018-09-01) (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-04-14 | ||||
9 | Mathias Honsak (from 2018-07-16) (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-12-20 | |||
10 | Heinz Morschel (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-08-24 | |||
14 | Aaron Seydel (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-02-07 | |||
17 | Steven Lewerenz (until 2019-01-05) | 1991-05-18 | |||
23 | Janni Serra (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-03-13 | |||
30 | Benjamin Girth (until 2019-01-03) | 1992-01-31 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Benjamin Girth (from 2019-01-03) (until 2020-06-30) | 1992-01-31 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2018-08-19 18:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2018-10-31 20:45 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2019-02-06 18:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |