Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ralf Rangnick (until 2019-06-30) | 1958-06-29 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Peter Gulacsi | 1990-05-06 | |||
21 | Marius Muller (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-07-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Dominic Minz (until 2018-06-30) | 1999-03-07 | ||||
3 | Marcelo Saracchi (until 2020-01-06) | 1998-04-23 | |||
4 | Willi Orban (until 2021-06-30) | 1992-11-03 | |||
5 | Dayot Upamecano (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-10-27 | |||
6 | Ibrahima Konate (until 2021-06-30) | 1999-05-25 | |||
16 | Lukas Klostermann | 1996-06-03 | |||
22 | Nordi Mukiele (until 2022-07-25) | 1997-11-01 | |||
23 | Marcel Halstenberg (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-09-27 | |||
33 | Atinc Nukan (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-07-20 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Erik Majetschak (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-03-01 | ||||
Mads Bidstrup (from 2019-03-15) (until 2019-06-30) | 2001-02-25 | ||||
7 | Marcel Sabitzer (until 2021-08-30) | 1994-03-17 | |||
8 | Amadou Haidara (from 2019-01-01) | 1998-01-31 | |||
13 | Stefan Ilsanker (until 2020-01-31) | 1989-05-18 | |||
18 | Tyler Adams (from 2019-01-01) (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-02-14 | |||
18 | Emile Smith Rowe (from 2019-01-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-07-28 | |||
26 | Niclas Stierlin (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-01-22 | |||
27 | Konrad Laimer (until 2023-06-30) | 1997-05-27 | |||
31 | Diego Demme (until 2020-01-11) | 1991-11-21 | |||
35 | Massimo Bruno (until 2018-08-31) | 1993-09-17 | |||
39 | Fabrice Hartmann (until 2019-06-30) | 2001-03-02 | |||
44 | Kevin Kampl | 1990-10-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Oliver Bias (until 2019-06-30) | 2001-06-15 | ||||
Lukas Kruger (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-09-06 | ||||
9 | Yussuf Poulsen | 1994-06-15 | |||
10 | Emil Forsberg (until 2023-12-31) | 1991-10-23 | |||
11 | Timo Werner (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-03-06 | |||
17 | Bruma (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-10-24 | |||
20 | Matheus Cunha (until 2020-01-31) | 1999-05-27 | |||
29 | Jean-Kevin Augustin (until 2019-09-01) | 1997-06-16 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Elias Abouchabaka (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-03-31 | ||||
Felix Beiersdorf (until 2018-12-31) | 1998-08-01 | ||||
28 | Yvon Mvogo (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-06-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2018-08-19 15:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2018-10-31 20:45 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 2019-02-06 18:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2019-04-02 20:45 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2019-04-23 20:45 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 2019-05-25 20:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |