Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Mike Terranova (until 2020-06-30) | 1976-11-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Patrick Bade (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-01-10 | |||
27 | Robin Udegbe (until 2019-01-25) | 1991-03-20 | |||
31 | Daniel Davari (from 2019-01-26) (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-01-06 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
4 | Mike Jordan (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-01-03 | |||
5 | Jasper Stojan (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-04-22 | |||
14 | Nico Klass (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-04-03 | |||
17 | Tim Hermes (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-06-08 | |||
21 | Philipp Eggersgluss (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-04-28 | |||
23 | Kai Nakowitsch (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-01-18 | |||
30 | Jannik Lohden (until 2020-06-30) | 1989-07-16 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Christian Marz (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-07-05 | |||
8 | Dario Schumacher (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-04-01 | |||
10 | Patrick Bauder (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-02-18 | |||
13 | Dominik Reinert (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-10-13 | |||
15 | Maik Odenthal (until 2022-06-30) | 1992-11-07 | |||
16 | Rinor Rexha (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-05-19 | |||
18 | Ahmet-Malik Uzun (until 2019-12-31) | 1999-10-19 | |||
26 | Alexander Scheelen (until 2021-06-30) | 1987-06-25 | |||
28 | Yassin Ben Balla (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-02-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Shaibou Oubeyapwa (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-03-27 | |||
9 | Philipp Godde (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-06-05 | |||
11 | Cihan Ozkara (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-07-14 | |||
19 | Raphael Steinmetz (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-07-28 | |||
20 | Tarik Kurt (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-02-22 | |||
24 | Francis Ubabuike (from 2019-01-21) (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-11-17 | |||
25 | Marvin Lorch (until 2018-12-31) | 1996-12-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2018-08-18 18:30 |
0 : 6 |
Schema Compare |