Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Stefan Leitl (from 2019-02-05) (until 2022-06-30) | 1977-08-29 | ||||
Damir Buric (until 2019-02-04) | 1964-07-07 | ||||
Oliver Barth (from 2018-08-20) (until 2018-08-21) | 1979-10-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Marius Funk (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-01-01 | |||
25 | Leon Schaffran (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-07-31 | |||
30 | Sascha Burchert (until 2022-06-30) | 1989-10-30 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Stephen Sama (until 2018-07-26) | 1993-03-05 | ||||
3 | Maximilian Wittek (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-08-21 | |||
4 | Lukas Gugganig (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-02-14 | |||
5 | Richard Magyar (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-05-03 | |||
13 | Marco Caligiuri (until 2020-06-30) | 1984-04-14 | |||
19 | Roberto Hilbert (until 2019-06-30) | 1984-10-16 | |||
22 | Mario Maloca (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-05-04 | |||
23 | Paul Jaeckel (from 2018-08-30) (until 2021-06-30) | 1998-07-22 | |||
24 | Maximilian Sauer (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-05-15 | |||
29 | Tobias Mohr (until 2020-01-10) | 1995-08-24 | |||
38 | Maximilian Bauer (until 2020-06-30) | 2000-02-09 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Paul Seguin (from 2019-01-17) (until 2019-06-30) | 1995-03-29 | ||||
6 | Yosuke Ideguchi (from 2018-08-21) (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-08-23 | |||
7 | Levent Aycicek (until 2019-01-24) | 1994-02-12 | |||
9 | Shawn Parker (from 2018-08-15) (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-03-07 | |||
11 | David Raum (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-04-22 | |||
14 | Hans Nunoo Sarpei (from 2019-01-23) (until 2021-12-31) | 1998-08-22 | |||
15 | Sebastian Ernst (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-03-04 | |||
18 | Benedikt Kirsch (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-04-15 | |||
18 | Kenny Redondo (from 2019-01-11) (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-08-29 | |||
20 | David Atanga (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-12-25 | |||
21 | Nik Omladic (until 2019-08-28) | 1989-08-21 | |||
31 | Daniel Steininger (until 2020-01-17) | 1995-04-13 | |||
37 | Julian Green | 1995-06-06 | |||
40 | Patrick Sontheimer (until 2019-01-31) | 1998-07-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Elias Abouchabaka (until 2020-01-17) | 2000-03-31 | |||
9 | Serdar Dursun (until 2018-08-01) | 1991-10-19 | |||
10 | Daniel Keita-Ruel (until 2020-06-30) | 1989-09-21 | |||
17 | Fabian Reese (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-11-29 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Patrick Sontheimer (from 2019-01-31) (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-07-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 2018-08-20 20:45 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |