Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Alfons Weusthof (from 2019-01-01) (until 2019-06-30) | 1958-05-24 | ||||
Ansgar Schnabel (from 2018-12-02) (until 2018-12-31) | 1984-08-22 | ||||
Key Riebau (until 2018-11-12) | 1990-05-12 | ||||
Interimstrainer | |||||
Ansgar Schnabel (from 2018-11-12) (until 2018-12-01) | 1984-08-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Christian Meyer (until 2019-06-30) | 1987-03-01 | |||
12 | Felix Bohe (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-09-05 | |||
25 | Marco Maass (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-01-09 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
4 | Niklas-Leon von Aschwege (until 2024-06-30) | 1998-08-28 | |||
5 | Dennis Geiger (until 2019-06-30) | 1984-06-30 | |||
6 | Michel Leon Hahn | 1998-05-20 | |||
13 | Florian Stutz (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-01-21 | |||
16 | Patrick Papachristodoulou (from 2019-02-21) (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-08-11 | |||
17 | Peer Wegener (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-03-08 | |||
22 | Conor-Jonathan Gnerlich (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-11-03 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Almir Ziga (until 2022-06-30) | 1996-05-12 | |||
6 | Michel Leon Hahn (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-05-20 | |||
7 | Bastian Schaffer (until 2024-06-30) | 1994-12-12 | |||
10 | Bjorn Lindemann (until 2019-06-30) | 1984-01-23 | |||
11 | Keven Oltmer (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-11-11 | |||
15 | Fabian Burdenski (from 2018-08-15) (until 2018-12-31) | 1991-09-23 | |||
16 | Kevin Samide (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-05-17 | |||
18 | Julian Bennert (until 2024-06-30) | 1991-10-02 | |||
19 | Fabian Istefo (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-10-29 | |||
20 | Kasra Ghawilu (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-02-11 | |||
21 | Thorsten Tonnies (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-03-13 | |||
23 | Justin Bretgeld (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-05-12 | |||
24 | Mats Kaiser (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-08-22 | |||
27 | Fabio Grigoleit (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-05-21 | |||
Sturm | |||||
8 | Mario Fredehorst (until 2024-06-30) | 1993-04-29 | |||
14 | Shaun Minns (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-03-11 | |||
26 | Nils Laabs (until 2018-12-31) | 1984-02-29 | |||
31 | Marcel Gottschling (until 2018-08-25) | 1994-05-14 | |||
39 | Antonio Verinac (until 2023-06-30) | 2004-12-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2018-08-19 15:30 |
2 : 5 |
Schema Compare |