Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Holger Bachthaler (until 2022-06-30) | 1975-03-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | David Hundertmark (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-08-06 | |||
12 | Jerome Weisheit (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-05-03 | |||
39 | Christian Ortag | 1995-01-14 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Tino Bradara (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-12-12 | |||
3 | Michael Schindele (until 2020-06-30) | 1994-01-27 | |||
4 | Florian Krebs (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-11-15 | |||
5 | Johannes Reichert | 1991-07-02 | |||
15 | Marcel Schmidts (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-06-29 | |||
25 | Lukas Hoffmann (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-04-13 | |||
28 | Luis Grassow (until 2018-08-16) | 1998-07-08 | |||
30 | David Kammerbauer (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-02-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
6 | Luigi Campagna (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-12-11 | |||
7 | Albano Gashi (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-01-14 | |||
8 | Aron Viventi (until 2020-06-30) | 1997-05-08 | |||
13 | Felix Nierichlo (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-05-14 | |||
16 | Lennart Stoll (until 2020-06-30) | 1996-05-03 | |||
17 | Kai Luibrand (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-04-24 | |||
18 | Adrian Beck (until 2019-01-11) | 1997-06-09 | |||
20 | Alper Bagceci (until 2019-06-30) | 1984-04-16 | |||
21 | Nicolas Jann (until 2024-06-30) | 1992-03-21 | |||
22 | Vinko Sapina (until 2021-06-30) | 1995-06-29 | |||
24 | Georgio Manolakis (until 2018-12-31) | 1999-05-28 | |||
31 | Nico Gutjahr (until 2020-06-30) | 1993-05-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Thomas Rathgeber (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-04-30 | |||
10 | Ardian Morina (until 2022-06-30) | 1993-11-23 | |||
11 | David Braig (until 2020-01-01) | 1991-07-22 | |||
23 | Steffen Kienle (until 2021-01-28) | 1995-01-18 | |||
24 | Felix Higl (from 2019-01-27) (until 2021-06-30) | 1997-01-08 | |||
27 | Marcel Schmitt (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-01-18 | |||
29 | Vitalij Lux (until 2020-06-30) | 1989-02-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2018-08-18 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2018-10-30 18:30 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |