Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dimitrios Grammozis (from 2019-01-23) (until 2020-06-30) | 1978-07-08 | ||||
Kai Peter Schmitz (from 2019-02-19) (until 2019-06-30) | 1971-07-07 | ||||
Dirk Schuster (until 2019-02-18) | 1967-12-29 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Daniel Heuer Fernandes (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-11-13 | |||
22 | Rouven Sattelmaier (until 2019-06-30) | 1987-08-07 | |||
23 | Joel Mall (until 2018-08-10) | 1991-04-05 | |||
24 | Ihor Beresowski (from 2019-01-31) (until 2020-06-30) | 1990-08-24 | |||
31 | Florian Stritzel (until 2021-06-30) | 1994-01-31 | |||
35 | Josip Galic (until 2019-06-30) | 2000-01-25 | |||
38 | Max Grun (from 2018-09-03) (until 2019-06-30) | 1987-04-05 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Patrick Banggaard (until 2018-08-10) | 1994-04-04 | ||||
2 | Para (until 2018-08-22) | 1999-08-07 | |||
3 | Sebastian Hertner (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-05-02 | |||
3 | Joevin Jones (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-03-08 | |||
4 | Aytac Sulu (until 2019-01-11) | 1985-12-11 | |||
15 | Mathias Wittek (from 2019-01-31) (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-03-30 | |||
21 | Immanuel Hohn (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-12-23 | |||
28 | Marcel Franke (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-04-05 | |||
32 | Fabian Holland | 1990-07-11 | |||
37 | Patrick Herrmann (from 2019-01-29) (until 2021-06-30) | 1988-03-16 | |||
40 | Tim Rieder (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-09-03 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Slobodan Medojevic (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-11-20 | |||
6 | Marvin Mehlem (until 2022-06-30) | 1997-09-11 | |||
8 | Julian von Haacke (until 2018-08-22) | 1994-02-14 | |||
11 | Tobias Kempe | 1989-06-27 | |||
11 | Tobias Kempe (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-06-27 | |||
14 | Victor Palsson (from 2019-01-09) (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-04-30 | |||
17 | Sandro Sirigu (until 2019-06-30) | 1988-10-07 | |||
20 | Marcel Heller (from 2018-07-27) (until 2019-06-30) | 1986-02-12 | |||
23 | Soren Bertram (from 2019-01-11) (until 2019-06-30) | 1991-06-05 | |||
25 | Yannick Stark (until 2020-06-30) | 1990-10-28 | |||
26 | Christoph Moritz (from 2019-01-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-01-27 | |||
34 | Leon Müller (from 2019-02-12) (until 2020-08-28) | 2000-08-11 | |||
36 | Wilson Kamavuaka (until 2019-09-02) | 1990-03-29 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Selim Gunduz (from 2018-08-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-05-16 | ||||
7 | Felix Platte (until 2021-06-30) | 1996-02-11 | |||
9 | Johannes Wurtz (from 2018-08-23) (until 2020-08-17) | 1992-06-19 | |||
18 | Terrence Boyd (until 2019-02-05) | 1991-02-16 | |||
19 | Serdar Dursun (from 2018-08-01) (until 2021-06-30) | 1991-10-19 | |||
27 | Orrin McKinze Gaines II (until 2019-01-27) | 1998-03-02 | |||
40 | Silas Zehnder (until 2018-08-01) | 1999-06-30 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Romuald Lacazette (from 2018-08-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-01-03 | ||||
Patrick Banggaard (from 2018-08-11) (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-04-04 | ||||
Orrin McKinze Gaines II (from 2019-01-27) (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-03-02 | ||||
Silas Zehnder (from 2018-08-01) (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-06-30 | ||||
Jamie Maclaren (until 2019-01-31) | 1993-07-29 | ||||
8 | Julian von Haacke (from 2018-08-22) (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-02-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 2018-08-17 20:45 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 2018-10-30 18:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |