Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Horst Steffen (from 2018-10-29) (until 2023-06-30) | 1969-03-03 | ||||
Roland Seitz (until 2018-10-29) | 1964-10-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Frank Lehmann (until 2021-06-30) | 1989-04-29 | |||
20 | Dominik Draband (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-03-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Lukas Kohler (until 2021-06-30) | 1987-05-24 | |||
3 | Marco Kofler (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-08-05 | |||
5 | Mike Eglseder (until 2020-06-30) | 1992-11-22 | |||
8 | Aldin Skenderovic (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-06-28 | |||
16 | Leandro Grech (until 2019-06-30) | 1980-10-14 | |||
17 | Nils Winter (until 2020-09-30) | 1993-12-13 | |||
18 | Stefano Cincotta (until 2018-09-30) | 1991-02-28 | |||
23 | Oliver Stang (until 2020-06-30) | 1988-06-26 | |||
26 | Tim Steinmetz (from 2019-01-01) (until 2020-06-30) | 1999-09-15 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dennis Rosin (from 2019-01-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-06-27 | ||||
4 | Luca Blass (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-12-26 | |||
6 | Aleksandar Stevanovic (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-02-16 | |||
7 | Manuel Feil | 1994-10-08 | |||
10 | Sinan Tekerci (until 2023-06-30) | 1993-09-22 | |||
11 | Kevin Lahn (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-02-14 | |||
14 | Luca Durholtz (until 2019-06-30) | 1993-08-18 | |||
15 | Moritz Koch (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-08-06 | |||
19 | Patryk Dragon (until 2019-06-30) | 1996-04-11 | |||
21 | Gaetan Krebs (until 2020-06-30) | 1985-11-18 | |||
22 | Israel Suero Fernandez (until 2023-01-30) | 1994-04-12 | |||
27 | Benno Mohr (until 2020-06-30) | 1995-11-18 | |||
32 | Alban Meha (until 2019-06-30) | 1986-04-26 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Muhamed Alawie (until 2019-06-11) | 1988-04-30 | |||
29 | Julius Perstaller (until 2019-06-30) | 1989-04-08 | |||
30 | Jean Koffi (until 2019-06-30) | 1986-06-25 | |||
31 | Kai Merk (until 2020-06-30) | 1998-08-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 2018-08-18 15:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |