Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Daniel Bierofka (until 2019-11-05) | 1979-02-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Marco Hiller | 1997-02-20 | |||
30 | Johann Hipper (until 2019-06-30) | 1998-09-30 | |||
39 | Hendrik Bonmann (until 2020-07-05) | 1994-01-22 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Eric Weeger (until 2020-07-05) | 1997-02-02 | |||
4 | Felix Weber (until 2020-07-05) | 1995-01-18 | |||
6 | Jan Mauersberger (until 2019-06-30) | 1985-06-17 | |||
11 | Christian Koppel (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-11-03 | |||
17 | Daniel Wein (until 2023-06-30) | 1994-02-05 | |||
22 | Aaron Berzel (until 2020-07-05) | 1992-05-29 | |||
27 | Semi Belkahia (until 2023-06-30) | 1998-12-22 | |||
28 | Herbert Paul (until 2020-07-05) | 1994-02-11 | |||
32 | Simon Lorenz (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-03-30 | |||
36 | Phillipp Steinhart (until 2023-06-30) | 1992-07-07 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
5 | Quirin Moll (until 2023-06-30) | 1991-01-21 | |||
8 | Simon Seferings (until 2019-01-31) | 1995-07-05 | |||
14 | Dennis Dressel (until 2022-06-30) | 1998-10-26 | |||
16 | Benjamin Kindsvater (until 2020-07-05) | 1993-02-08 | |||
19 | Alessandro Abruscia (until 2019-06-30) | 1990-07-12 | |||
20 | Efkan Bekiroglu (until 2020-07-05) | 1995-09-14 | |||
25 | Marius Willsch (from 2018-07-11) (until 2020-06-30) | 1991-03-18 | |||
34 | Kristian Bohnlein (until 2020-07-05) | 1990-05-10 | |||
38 | Romuald Lacazette (from 2018-08-31) (until 2019-06-30) | 1994-01-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Stefan Lex (until 2023-06-30) | 1989-11-27 | |||
9 | Sascha Molders (until 2021-12-19) | 1985-03-20 | |||
10 | Adriano Grimaldi (until 2019-01-22) | 1991-04-05 | |||
13 | Prince Osei Owusu (from 2019-01-26) (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-01-07 | |||
18 | Nico Karger (until 2020-07-05) | 1993-02-01 | |||
21 | Ugur Mustafa Turk (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-06-24 | |||
23 | Nicholas Helmbrecht (until 2019-01-31) | 1995-01-30 | |||
24 | Markus Ziereis (until 2020-07-05) | 1992-08-26 | |||
31 | Kodjovi Koussou (until 2019-06-30) | 1992-06-22 | |||
35 | Noel Niemann (until 2019-06-30) | 1999-11-14 | |||
verliehen | |||||
Gyorgy Hursan (until 2019-06-30) | 1997-02-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 2018-08-19 18:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |